EP2269424 - INDUCTIVE COMPONENT FOR ACTIVATING LIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMIDA Components & Modules GmbH Dr. Hans-Vogt-Platz 1 94130 Obernzell / DE | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Vogt Electronic Components GmbH Vogt Electronic Platz 1 94130 Obernzell / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGWIRTH, Herbert Schachet 10 94051 Hauzenberg / DE | 02 /
KARL, Gerhard Kohlstattstra. 72 94139 Breitenberg / DE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09726552.4 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP02477 | Priority number, date | DE20081017314 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008017314 | [2011/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009121627 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2269424 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/02, H01F38/08 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H05B41/02 (EP);
H01F3/08 (EP);
H01F38/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVES BAUELEMENT ZUR ANSTEUERUNG VON LEUCHTEN | [2011/01] | English: | INDUCTIVE COMPONENT FOR ACTIVATING LIGHTS | [2011/01] | French: | COMPOSANT INDUCTIF POUR LA COMMANDE DE LUMINAIRES | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US6903648 (BAUMANN MICHAEL [DE]; WINKLER JOHANN [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10; | [YA]EP1050897 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [J) [Y] 7-10 * the whole document * [A] 1-6; | [YA]WO03075619 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; VAN CASTEREN DOLF H J [NL]; COUWE) [Y] 9-10 * the whole document * [A] 1-8; | [A]EP0931779 (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007000352 (VOGT ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS GMB [DE]; GERHARD KARL [DE]; BLASCHKE WALTE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10216846 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0388930 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |