EP2257714 - THREAD-FORMING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ludwig Hettich & Co. Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 78713 Schramberg-Sulgen / DE | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HETTICH, Ulrich Im Hagenwinkel 67/2 78713 Schramberg / DE | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09726885.8 | 09.02.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009EP00895 | Priority number, date | DE20081016866 | 02.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008016866 | [2010/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121448 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257714 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2257714 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/10 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
F16B25/10 (EP,US);
F16B25/0026 (EP,US);
F16B25/0057 (EP,US);
F16B25/0094 (EP,US);
F16B35/041 (EP,US);
F16B5/0275 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49881 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | GEWINDE FURCHENDE SCHRAUBE | [2010/49] | English: | THREAD-FORMING SCREW | [2010/49] | French: | VIS TARAUDEUSE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 12.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2009 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | IE | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MK | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | LU | 09.02.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
LU | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH237674 (ADRIEN LADOR SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 6-8; | [A]US2549393 (SIESEL JOSEPHINE M) [A] 1,9,11,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO8200505 (STEENGRACHT MOYLAND J) [A] 1,9,11,12* figure 2 * |