EP2267878 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagasaki University, National University Corporation 1-14 Bunkyo-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 852-8521 / JP | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Fujio c/o Nagasaki University National University Corporation 1-14 Bunkyo-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki 852-8521 / JP | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09726977.3 | 28.02.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009JP53773 | Priority number, date | JP20080094408 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008094408 | [2010/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009122833 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267878 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/155, H02M3/157, // H02M1/00, H02M3/156 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (KR);
G05F1/10 (KR);
H02M3/145 (KR);
H02M1/0012 (EP,US);
H02M3/1566 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | H02M3/155 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER STROMUMRICHTSCHALTUNG | [2010/52] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT | [2010/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION D ÉNERGIE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2010 | Translation filed | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2015 | 28.02.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007257653 (NAKA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0142] *; | [I]US2006152204 (MAKSIMOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055]; figure 6 *; | [I]WO2007138513 (NXP BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 15; figure 6 *; | [I]US2005168198 (MAKSIMOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093]; figure 12 * | International search | [A]JPH02262868 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2007325365 (KAWAMURA ELECTRIC INC) |