EP2265389 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COATING AN ARTICLE USING A SPRAY-COATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENEQ OY Ensimmäinen savu 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHONEN, Sampo Terästie 13 B FI-02750 Espoo / FI | 02 /
VAINIO, Tommi Tuulihaukankuja 4 D 7 FI-01150 Söderkulla / FI | 03 /
RAJALA, Markku Jousitie 3 FI-01280 Vantaa / FI | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
AHONEN, Sampo Terästie 13 B FI-02750 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
VAINIO, Tommi Tuulihaukankuja 4 D 7 FI-01150 Söderkulla / FI | |||
03 /
RAJALÄ, Markku Jousitie 3 FI-01280 Vantaa / FI | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/04] | Parta, Ari Petri, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/52] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09727648.9 | 02.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009FI00045 | Priority number, date | FI20080000264 | 03.04.2008 Original published format: FI 20080264 | [2010/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009122004 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265389 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B05B7/00, B05D5/00, C23C4/12, C23C26/00, // B05D3/04 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B05D1/02 (EP,FI,US);
B05B7/00 (FI);
B05D5/00 (FI);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
B05D2201/00 (EP,US);
B05D2202/00 (EP,US);
B05D2203/22 (EP,US);
B05D2203/35 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | B05D1/02, B05B7/00, B05D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES ARTIKELS MIT EINEM SPRITZBESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COATING AN ARTICLE USING A SPRAY-COATING METHOD | [2010/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE REVÊTEMENT D'UN ARTICLE À L'AIDE D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT PAR PULVÉRISATION | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 14.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 02.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5882368 (FALCONY-GUAJARDO CIRO [MX], et al); | [X]US2003222019 (FULTON JOHN L [US], et al); | [X]WO2007000330 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [XI]EP1839764 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]WO2008049954 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al) | International search | [A]FI53696B (GLAVERBEL [BE]); | [X]US5540959 (WANG XINGWU [US]); | [X]US5882368 (FALCONY-GUAJARDO CIRO [MX], et al); | [A]WO0039358 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X]US2002100416 (SUN JAMES J [US], et al) |