EP2271544 - BICYCLE SUSPENSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accell Suisse AG Industriestrasse 21 6055 Alpnach Dorf / CH | [2016/20] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Cycles Lapierre Rue Edmond Voisenet 21000 Dijon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANTET, Pierre-Geoffroy Adolf Kolping Straße 20 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
ANTONOT, Emmanuel 18 rue des Forges 88700 saint Gorgon / FR | 03 /
GRIBAUDO, Rémy 2 allée Jacques laurent F-21000 Dijon / FR | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
PLANTET, Pierre-Geoffroy 12 avenue du Puy de Dome F-63100 Clermont Ferrand / FR | ||
02 /
ANTONOT, Emmanuel 10 rue Moulin F-21490 Clenay / FR | |||
03 /
GRIBAUDO, Rémy 33L Avenue Jean-Jaurès F-21000 Dijon / FR | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2011/02] | Cabinet Plasseraud 235 Cours Lafayette 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 09728024.2 | 02.04.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009EP53966 | Priority number, date | FR20080052161 | 02.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852161 | [2011/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121936 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271544 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271544 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62K25/28, B62K25/08 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B62K25/286 (EP,US);
B62K25/08 (EP,US);
B62K2025/044 (EP,US);
B62K2025/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | FAHRRADAUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/02] | English: | BICYCLE SUSPENSION SYSTEM | [2011/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUSPENSION POUR BICYCLETTE | [2011/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 09.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE BMC Switzerland AG Sportstrasse 49 2540 Grenchen / CH Opponent's representative Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2013/22] | 04.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2016 | 07.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.12.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2009 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MC | 25.07.2012 | MK | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | IE | 02.04.2013 | LU | 02.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/37] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MK | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2013 | ||
LU | 02.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MK | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2013 | ||
LU | 02.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MK | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | |
NO | 25.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1241087 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] * * column 9, line 48 - line 52 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 2 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [A]DE102005025811 (KAMM THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]US2001030408 (MIYOSHI HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP2103512 | by applicant | US2002109332 |