EP2274496 - A DEVICE FOR REGISTRATION OF ROTATIONAL PARAMETERS DURING ASSEMBLY OF A PIPE STRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odfjell Casing Services As Hammaren 19 4056 Tananger / NO | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRØM, Alf, Terje Nordahaugen 3a N-4085 Hundvåg / NO | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS Postboks 171 4302 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 09728231.3 | 16.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009NO00095 | Priority number, date | NO20080001650 | 03.04.2008 Original published format: NO 20081650 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009123462 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274496 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B3/02, E21B19/06, E21B19/16, G01L3/10 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
G01L3/10 (EP,US);
E21B19/166 (EP,US);
E21B44/00 (EP,US);
G01L3/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGISTRIERUNG DER DREHPARAMETER WÄHREND DER MONTAGE EINES ROHRSTRANGS | [2011/03] | English: | A DEVICE FOR REGISTRATION OF ROTATIONAL PARAMETERS DURING ASSEMBLY OF A PIPE STRING | [2011/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PARAMETRES DE ROTATION AU COURS DU MONTAGE D'UNE COLONNE DE TUBES | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 15.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007251701 (JAHN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * [I] 12,13; | [I]WO2006087239 (DIAMANT DRILLING SERVICES SA [BE], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, lines 29-33 * * page 4, lines 12-33 * * page 5, lines 10-17 *; | [A]WO2005065364 (VARCO INT [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5, lines 14-16, 33-35 * | International search | [X]US2007251701 (JAHN MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]US3929009 (LUTZ JEAN, et al); | [A]US3691825 (DYER NORMAN D); | [A]WO2005065364 (VARCO INT [US]); | [A]US5705757 (WOZNIAK MICHAEL C [US]) |