EP2274356 - HIGH HEAT RESISTANT ADHESIVE AND SEALANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/48] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Henkel Loctite Corporation 1001 Trout Brook Crossing Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yue, S. 36 Carlton Drive Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 02 /
MOORE, Louis, A. 11 Wharton Way High Bridge, NJ 08829 / US | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2011/03] | Kann, Wolfgang, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA FJI Patents 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09728873.2 | 26.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US38328 | Priority number, date | US20080060553 | 01.04.2008 Original published format: US 60553 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009123905 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274356 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274356 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/38, C09J175/04 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/3212 (EP,US);
C08G18/3831 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G2170/20 (EP,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGER KLEBSTOFF UND DICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/03] | English: | HIGH HEAT RESISTANT ADHESIVE AND SEALANT COMPOSITIONS | [2011/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES ET ÉTANCHÉIFIANTES TRÈS RÉSISTANTES À LA CHALEUR | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2009 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | IE | 26.03.2019 | LU | 26.03.2019 | MT | 26.03.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.03.2009 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005100430 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 4, paragraphs 3-5 * * page 12, paragraphs 1,2 * * examples 3-10; claims 1-6,9-13,15,18 *; | [A]CA2198444 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,5; table 1 *; | [A]US5001210 (COURY ARTHUR J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * examples 1,2,7,8; claims 1,2,8 *; | [A]EP1378531 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0107014 | US4288577 |