EP2264078 - HYDROGENATED BETA-PINENE-BASED POLYMER AND MOLDED ARTICLE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAHARA, Atsuhiro c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
TOKUYASU, Jin c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 03 /
HORI, Takashi c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 04 /
OHGI, Hiroyuki c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2015/10] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
NAKAHARA, Atsuhiro c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | ||
02 /
TOKUYASU, Jin c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | |||
03 /
HORI, Takashi c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
04 /
OHGI, Hiroyuki c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2010/51] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09729351.8 | 09.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009JP57247 | Priority number, date | JP20080102682 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008102682 | [2010/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125810 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264078 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264078 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F32/00, C08F8/04 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C08F8/04 (EP,US);
C08F210/14 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/04, C08F10/14 (EP,US);
C08F210/14, C08F210/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | AUF HYDRIERTEM BETA-PINEN BASIERENDES POLYMER UND FORMARTIKEL DAMIT | [2010/51] | English: | HYDROGENATED BETA-PINENE-BASED POLYMER AND MOLDED ARTICLE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2010/51] | French: | POLYMÈRE HYDROGÉNÉ À BASE DE BETA-PINÈNE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ LE CONTENANT | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2010 | Translation filed | 14.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2009 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | IE | 09.04.2015 | LU | 09.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | GB | 04.06.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 09.04.2009 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.04.2009 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2075265 (YASUHARA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0072] , [0073] , [0076] , [0080] , [0081] *; | [XD] - "Biomass-derived heat-resistant alicyclic hydrocarbon polymers: poly(terpenes) and their hydrogenated derivatives", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20010620), vol. 8, pages 878 - 882, XP002623956 [XD] 1-6 * pages 878, 881; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b607789g | International search | [X] - HIROKO SUGIYAMA ET AL., "Shokubutsu Yurai no Shikanshiki Tanka Suisokei Polymer no Gosei", POLYMER PREPRINTS, JAPAN, (20060905), vol. 55, no. 2, page 2Z10 | [A] - HIROKO SUGIYAMA ET AL., "Shokubutsu Yurai no Shikanshiki Terpene no Seimitsu Cation Jugo", POLYMER PREPRINTS, JAPAN, (20060510), vol. 55, no. 1, page 1PE011 | [A] - HIROKO SUGIYAMA ET AL., "Shokubutsu Yurai beta-pinene no Seimitsu Seigyo Cation Jugo", POLYMER PREPRINTS, JAPAN, (20070904), vol. 56, no. 2, page 1PE017 | [A] - HIROKO SUGIYAMA ET AL., "beta-pinene no Seimitsu Cation Jugo ni yoru Shinki Tankasui Sokei Polymer no Kaihatsu", Annual Meeting of Union of Chemistry-Related Societies in Chubu Area, Japan, 10 November, 2007 (10.11.07), vol. 38TH, page 158 | by applicant | JP2002121231 | - "Biomass-derived heat-resistant alicyclic hydrocarbon polymers: poly(terpenes) and their hydrogenated derivatives", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 8, pages 878 - 882 | - "Synthesis of High Moleculer Weight Poly(? - Pinene)", ADVANCES IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 100, pages 1 - 9 |