EP2293890 - ROLL FORMER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTI-DIRECTIONALLY SWEPT BEAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | MULTI-DIRECTIONALLY SWEPT BEAM, ROLL FORMER, AND METHOD | ||
[2018/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shape Corp. 1900 Hayes Street Grand Haven, MI 49417 / US | [2012/36] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Shape Corporation 1900 Hayes Street Grand Haven, MI 49417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZ, Richard, D. 12510 Johnson Grand Haven MI 49417 / US | 02 /
LYONS, Bruce, W. 14872 Bignell Drive Grand Haven MI 49417 / US | 03 /
GOULD, Bryan, E. 14707 - 104th Avenue Coopersville MI 49404 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Ruhrmann, Andrea Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09730009.9 | 08.04.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US39853 | Priority number, date | US20080043541P | 09.04.2008 Original published format: US 43541 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009126677 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293890 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/08, B21D5/14, B21D7/08 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B21D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
B21D41/02 (EP,US);
B21D5/086 (EP,US);
B21D5/14 (KR);
B21D51/10 (EP,US);
B21D53/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | FORMWALZVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRRICHTUNGSLÄNGSGEKRÜMMTEN TRÄGERN | [2018/43] | English: | ROLL FORMER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTI-DIRECTIONALLY SWEPT BEAMS | [2018/42] | French: | FORMEUR À GALETS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DES POUTRES BALAYÉES DE FAÇON MULTIDIRECTIONNELLE | [2018/42] |
Former [2011/11] | MEHRRICHTUNGSLÄNGSGEKRÜMMTER TRÄGER, FORMWALZVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2011/11] | MULTI-DIRECTIONALLY SWEPT BEAM, ROLL FORMER, AND METHOD | ||
Former [2011/11] | POUTRE BALAYÉE DE FAÇON MULTIDIRECTIONNELLE, FORMEUR À GALETS ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 12.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS59179227 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO) [X] 1,3-7,13-15 * abstract * [Y] 2,8,9; | [XY]JPS60158920 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO) [X] 1,3-7,13-15 * abstract * [Y] 2,8,9; | [YDA]US5092512 (STURRUS PETER [US], et al) [YD] 8,9 * the whole document *[A] 1-7,13-15; | [Y]US5829666 (TAKEDA SHINYA [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [XA]US2004164566 (JAEGER WALTER D [US], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * [A] 1-9,13,14; | [XA]US2004169380 (BLADOW JEFF [US], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * [A] 1-9,13,14 | International search | [A]JPS61132226 (HASHIMOTO FORMING CO LTD); | [A]JPH0237919 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY); | [Y]JPH09225540 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO); | [Y]US2007180880 (LYONS BRUCE W [US], et al) |