EP2274402 - CATALYSTS HAVING SELECTED PORE SIZE DISTRIBUTIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SUCH CATALYSTS, METHODS OF PRODUCTING A CRUDE PRODUCT USING SAID CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/03] | CATALYSTS HAVING SELECTED PORE SIZE DISTRIBUTIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SUCH CATALYSTS, METHODS OF PRODUCTING A CRUDE PRODUCT, PRODUCTS OBTAINED FROM SUCH METHODS, AND USES OF PRODUCTS OBTAINED | ||
[2017/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2018/13] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELLINGTON, Scott Lee 5109 Aspen Street Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 02 /
BHAN, Opinder Kishan 714 Cranfield Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | [2017/30] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
WELLINGTON, Scott, Lee 5109 Aspen Street Bellaire TX 77401 / US | ||
02 /
BHAN, Opinder, Kishan 714 Cranfield Court Katy TX 77450 / US | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/03] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 09730104.8 | 10.06.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US46917 | Priority number, date | US20080043926 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: US 43926 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009126973 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2274402 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274402 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/02, C10G47/02, C10G49/02, B01J35/10 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C10G49/02 (EP,US);
B01J27/19 (KR);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J23/24 (EP,US);
B01J23/883 (EP,US);
B01J35/60 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
B01J35/69 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
C10G45/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10G47/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/34 (EP,US);
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J23/70 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,US);
B01J37/22 (EP,US);
C10G2300/208 (EP,US);
C10G2300/302 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATOREN MIT AUSGEWÄHLTEN PORENGRÖSSENVERTEILUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERARTIGER KATALYSATOREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHPRODUKTS UNTER VERWENDUNG DER KATALYSATOREN | [2017/15] | English: | CATALYSTS HAVING SELECTED PORE SIZE DISTRIBUTIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SUCH CATALYSTS, METHODS OF PRODUCTING A CRUDE PRODUCT USING SAID CATALYSTS | [2017/15] | French: | CATALYSEURS AYANT DES DISTRIBUTIONS SÉLECTIONNÉES DE TAILLES DES PORES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE TELS CATALYSEURS, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT BRUT EN UTILISANT LESDITS CATALYSEURS | [2017/15] |
Former [2011/03] | KATALYSATOREN MIT AUSGEWÄHLTEN PORENGRÖSSENVERTEILUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERARTIGER KATALYSATOREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHPRODUKTS, NACH DERARTIGEN VERFAHREN ERHALTENE PRODUKTE UND VERWENDUNGEN VON ERHALTENEN PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2011/03] | CATALYSTS HAVING SELECTED PORE SIZE DISTRIBUTIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SUCH CATALYSTS, METHODS OF PRODUCTING A CRUDE PRODUCT, PRODUCTS OBTAINED FROM SUCH METHODS, AND USES OF PRODUCTS OBTAINED | ||
Former [2011/03] | CATALYSEURS AYANT DES DISTRIBUTIONS SÉLECTIONNÉES DE TAILLES DES PORES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE TELS CATALYSEURS, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D UN PRODUIT BRUT, PRODUITS OBTENUS PAR DE TELS PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS DES PRODUITS OBTENUS | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 10.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2009 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.06.2009 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2072697 (CA MINISTER ENERGY) [X] 11-14 * example 1 *; | [XA]CA1163614 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST) [X] 2-10 * page 18, line 13 - line 25; example 2; claim 1; table 3 * [A] 1; | [X]US4525472 (MORALES ALFREDO [VE], et al) [X] 11-14 * table 6 *; | [X]GB2167430 (INTEVEP SA) [X] 11,13,14 * tables 7,8,14,20 *; | [X]US4592827 (GALIASSO ROBERTO [VE], et al) [X] 11-14* table 3 *; | [X]US5322617 (DE BRUIJN THEO J W [CA], et al) [X] 11-14 * example 1; tables 2,3 *; | [XA]US5827421 (SHERWOOD JR DAVID EDWARD [US]) [X] 2-4 * column 14, line 50 - column 15, line 38; table 2 * [A] 1,5-10; | [XA]WO0232570 (SHELL OIL CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 20 - page 7, line 21; example 1; claim 1 * [A] 5-10; | [XA]US2005139522 (BHAN OPINDER K [US], et al) [X] 11,13,14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0078] , [0190] , [0209] , [0241] , [0243] , [0346] , [0262] , [343344]; tables 1,4 * [A] 1-10; | [XA]US2006116542 (BROWN DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045]; claim 1 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]WO2008016971 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]WO2008016969 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 * [A] 2-10; | [XP]WO2008045755 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-11,13,14 * figure 8; examples 26,27 * |