EP2271824 - GEOCHEMICAL SURVEILLANCE OF GAS PRODUCTION FROM TIGHT GAS FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Exploration Operating Company Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMALLEY, Philip, Craig 12 Levylsdene Guildford Surrey GU1 2RS / GB | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Ford, Louise Diane, et al BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [2014/08] |
Former [2011/02] | Collins, Frances Mary BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09730230.1 | 13.03.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009GB00683 | Priority number, date | EP20080251372 | 09.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08251372 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125161 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271824 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/02, E21B47/10 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
E21B49/02 (EP,US);
E21B43/00 (EP,US);
E21B43/006 (EP,US);
E21B47/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | GEOCHEMISCHE ÜBERWACHUNG DER GASPRODUKTION VON DICHTGASFELDERN | [2011/02] | English: | GEOCHEMICAL SURVEILLANCE OF GAS PRODUCTION FROM TIGHT GAS FIELDS | [2011/02] | French: | SURVEILLANCE GEOCHIMIQUE DE LA PRODUCTION DE GAZ DANS DES CHAMPS DE GAZ DE FORMATION IMPERMEABLE | [2011/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 15.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA1320007 (EXXON RESOURCES CANADA [CA]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 2 *; | [A]US3446597 (BRAY ELLIS E, et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5388456 (KETTEL DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE19621158 (UFZ LEIPZIGHALLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* column A *; | [A]RU2265715 (BARENBAUM AA ET AL.) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [DY] - STRAPOC ET AL, "Carbon isotopic fractionation of CH4 and CO2 during canister desorption of coal", ORGANIC GEOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, (20060201), vol. 37, no. 2, ISSN 0146-6380, pages 152 - 164, XP005271123 [DY] 1-9 * page 162, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.orggeochem.2005.10.002 | [DA] - ALEXEEV ET AL, "Methane desorption from a coal-bed", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, (20071009), vol. 86, no. 16, ISSN 0016-2361, pages 2574 - 2580, XP022293304 [DA] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2007.02.005 | by applicant | CA1320007 |