EP2268935 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/04] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRIENYOVSZKI, Sandor Petöfi u. 26, I/4 H-1042 Budapest / HU | 02 /
CZANEK, Peter Ilona u. 20 H-1162 Budapest / HU | 03 /
SIPOS, Andras Viola u. 16-18 V/503 H-1094 Budapest / HU | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/04] |
Former [2011/01] | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09730289.7 | 02.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP02395 | Priority number, date | DE20081018093 | 09.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008018093 | [2011/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009124684 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268935 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268935 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08, F15B15/28 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
F16D25/088 (EP);
F15B15/2861 (EP);
F16D2048/0254 (EP);
F16D2300/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN EINER KUPPLUNG | [2011/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A COUPLING | [2011/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UN EMBRAYAGE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2009 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | MT | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | AT | 02.04.2016 | IE | 02.04.2016 | LU | 02.04.2016 | SE | 03.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | GB | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
AT | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
SE | 03.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
AT | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
SE | 03.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
AT | 02.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
SE | 03.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
SE | 03.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
SE | 03.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
GB | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2842267 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-12 * figure .; claim 1 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]EP0834669 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 3,4 * figure 3 *; | [X]US4623840 (FUJIMURA TADATO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * figure - *; | [X]US4855675 (RUSSELL ALEXANDER [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * figure - *; | [X]US4628499 (HAMMETT GEOFFREY G [US]) [X] 1 * figure - * | [X] - BYSTROM E P ET AL, "A displacement sensor for nonmetallic hydraulic cylinders", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20031201), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 1530-437X, pages 818 - 826, XP011104229 [X] 1,2,6-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2003.820333 |