EP2263259 - METHOD FOR FORMING A CAPACITOR WITH HIGH ASPECT RATIO OPENINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/51] | HIGH ASPECT RATIO OPENINGS | ||
[2017/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIEHLBAUCH, Mark, W. 2002 E Goodman Court Boise ID 83712 / US | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/26] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2014/25] | Field, Howard John BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2010/51] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09731041.1 | 18.03.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009US01693 | Priority number, date | US20080099577 | 08.04.2008 Original published format: US 99577 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009126204 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263259 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263259 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/108, H01L21/8242, H01L27/04, H01L21/3065, H01G4/33, H01G4/012, H01L49/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H01G4/33 (EP,US);
H01G4/08 (US);
H01G4/012 (EP,US);
H01L28/90 (EP,US);
H10B12/033 (EP,US);
H10B12/09 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | H01L27/108, H01L21/8242, H01L27/04, H01L21/3065 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2010/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN KONDENSATOR MIT ÖFFNUNGEN MIT HOHEM ASPEKTVERHÄLTNIS | [2017/02] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A CAPACITOR WITH HIGH ASPECT RATIO OPENINGS | [2017/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN CONDENSATEUR AYANT DES OUVERTURES DE RAPPORT LARGEUR/LONGUEUR ELEVE | [2017/02] |
Former [2010/51] | ÖFFNUNGEN MIT HOHEM ASPEKTVERHÄLTNIS | ||
Former [2010/51] | HIGH ASPECT RATIO OPENINGS | ||
Former [2010/51] | OUVERTURES DE RAPPORT LARGEUR/LONGUEUR ELEVE | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005287738 (CHO SUNG-IL [KR], et al); | [A]US2006024904 (WILSON AARON R [US]); | [A]US2006099768 (YOKOI NAOKI [JP]); | WO2010019343 [ ] (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [T]EP2313925 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2005287795 (TOREK KEVIN [US], et al); | [A]US2007148984 (ABATCHEV MIRZAFER K [US], et al); | [A]KR20070098341 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]); | [A]KR20080001157 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]) | by applicant | US2005287738 |