EP2276600 - END MILL WITH VARYING HELIX ANGLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property Ab 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARDIVO, Maurizio Via Graziani 14 I-28060 Brentonico / IT | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/07] |
Former [2011/04] | WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstraße 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09731365.4 | 30.03.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009EP53708 | Priority number, date | DE20081018399 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008018399 | [2011/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009124851 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276600 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276600 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,US);
B23C2210/0485 (EP,US);
B23C2210/0492 (EP,US);
B23C2210/282 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1962 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | SCHAFTFRÄSER MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN DRALLWINKELN | [2011/04] | English: | END MILL WITH VARYING HELIX ANGLES | [2011/04] | French: | FRAISE À QUEUE PRÉSENTANT DIFFÉRENTS ANGLES D'INCLINAISON | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 09.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2013 | Observations by third parties | 05.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2014
18.11.2014
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2014
18.11.2014
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 17.12.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.11.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.07.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/36] | Appeal following opposition | 27.01.2017 | Appeal received No. T0285/17 | 03.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.07.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 29.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2009 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | AT | 30.03.2014 | IE | 30.03.2014 | LU | 30.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.03.2009 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
AT | 30.03.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.03.2009 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
AT | 30.03.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
AT | 30.03.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
AT | 30.03.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
AT | 30.03.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DY]DE3706282 (IZUMO SANGYO KK [JP]) [DY] 1-4,7-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3413290 (MOLTENI CORNELIO KOWAL TOOLS [IT]) [Y] 1-4,7-16 * page 4, paragraphs 2,3; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1894655 (FRAISA HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1,2 * | Examination | US2782490 | by applicant | DE3706282 | other | US2782490 |