EP2265873 - STORAGE COMPARTMENT FOR PRODUCTS TO BE REFRIGERATED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUD, Ralph Belfordstrasse 6 81669 München / DE | 02 /
TISCHER, Thomas Jagdstrasse 9 85540 Haar / DE | [2010/52] | Application number, filing date | 09731816.6 | 08.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009EP54232 | Priority number, date | DE20082005349U | 17.04.2008 Original published format: DE 202008005349 U | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127576 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265873 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/04 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
F25D23/04 (EP);
F25D2331/805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | KÜHLGUTABSTELLFACH | [2010/52] | English: | STORAGE COMPARTMENT FOR PRODUCTS TO BE REFRIGERATED | [2010/52] | French: | COMPARTIMENT À PRODUIT RÉFRIGÉRÉ | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 17.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2006011084 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [X] 1-2,5-6,9-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] * [Y] 3-4,7-8; | [Y]WO9834526 (MOET & CHANDON [FR], et al) [Y] 3-4 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2007278679 (KAGAWA KUNIYUKI) [Y] 7-8 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]KR20020057633 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-2,9-12 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN1982817 (HAIER GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1,7-8 * figure 1 * | Examination | US2006260352 | by applicant | WO2006011084 | WO9834526 | JP2007278679 | KR20020057633 |