EP2153516 - INVERTER CONTROLLER, COMPRESSOR, AND ELECTRIC HOME APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAHARA Hideharu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KODA Atsushi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09732315.8 | 16.04.2009 | [2010/07] | WO2009JP01749 | Priority number, date | JP20080108607 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008108607 | JP20080289554 | 12.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008289554 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128268 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153516 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153516 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/14, H02P6/18 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H02P6/182 (EP,US);
H02P6/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | WECHSELRICHTERSTEUERUNG, VERDICHTER UND ELEKTRISCHES HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [2010/07] | English: | INVERTER CONTROLLER, COMPRESSOR, AND ELECTRIC HOME APPLIANCE | [2010/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ONDULEUR, COMPRESSEUR, ET APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HR | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | MK | 09.03.2011 | MT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | IE | 16.04.2011 | LU | 16.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | FR | 09.05.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | NO | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
LU | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 09.05.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
LU | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 09.05.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 09.05.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 09.05.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 09.05.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.03.2011 | |
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08140391 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-4,8-14 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH08163891 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,8-14 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH1175396 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-4,8-14 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2000037093 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-4,8-14* abstract *; | [Y]WO2006107040 (MITSUBA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2009009117 (SOMEYA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 5-7 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0022] , [0031] , [0044] , [0077]; figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] * |