EP2265235 - BANDAGING ELEMENT OF FIRST AID BANDAGE AND FIRST AID BANDAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suutari, Janne Kielontie 9-11 G 15 87500 Kajaani / FI | For all designated states Liuke, Markku Rihlakuja 5 B 00920 Helsinki / FI | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Sepänkatu 20 90100 Oulu / FI | [2014/08] |
Former [2010/52] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 FI-90100 Oulu / FI | Application number, filing date | 09732544.3 | 25.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009FI50228 | Priority number, date | FI20080005322 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: FI 20085322 | [2010/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127777 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265235 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61F15/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61F15/002 (EP,US);
A61F13/00 (FI);
A61F15/00 (FI);
A61F15/005 (EP,US);
A61F15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | VERBANDELEMENT FÜR ERSTE-HILFE-VERBAND UND ERSTE-HILFE-VERBAND | [2010/52] | English: | BANDAGING ELEMENT OF FIRST AID BANDAGE AND FIRST AID BANDAGE | [2010/52] | French: | ELÉMENT DE BANDAGE POUR BANDAGE DE PREMIER SECOURS ET BANDAGE DE PREMIER SECOURS | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5628723 (GRAU BERNARD [IL]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 6; figures 3-10 *; | [AD]US6593508 (HARDER ROBERT H [US]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5628723 (GRAU BERNARD [IL]); | [A]CN200984285Y (INST OF HYGIENIC EQUIPMENT ACA [CN]); | [A]US2007185428 (HARDER ROBERT H [US]); | [A]WO2007043749 (PARK HYUNG SOON [KR]) |