EP2269082 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREDICTING A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY'S LIFETIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTENS, Hubert, C., F. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09732546.8 | 09.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009IB51500 | Priority number, date | EP20080154593 | 16.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08154593 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127999 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269082 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DER LEBENSDAUER EINER WIEDERAUFLADBAREN BATTERIE | [2011/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREDICTING A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY'S LIFETIME | [2011/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRÉDIRE LA DURÉE DE VIE D'UNE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 24.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/26] | 07.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19540827 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * claim 9 *; | [X]EP1167988 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP]) [X] 1-4,11-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] , [0024]; figures 1,3-5 *; | [Y]WO0250927 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 8-10 * page 4, lines 6-1121-25 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 2 *; | [X]EP1482318 (YUASA BATTERY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,11-13 * paragraphs [0048] , [0051] - [0053] - [0056] , [0058] , [0067]; figures 1-4,6 *; | [XY]US2005001627 (ANBUKY ADNAN H [NZ], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-13 * paragraph [0026] * * abstract * [Y] 8-10; | [PX]EP1918729 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [PX] 1-5,8-13* paragraphs [0007] , [0020] - [0023] - [0026] , [0030]; figures 1,3 * | Examination | US2007252600 | by applicant | WO0250927 | US2005016267 | WO2006094287 |