EP2269429 - THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE MOUNTING ELEMENT FOR ATTACHMENT OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD TO HEAT SINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REBERGEN, Johannes, A. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/01] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09732751.4 | 10.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009IB51521 | Priority number, date | EP20080154716 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08154716 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128005 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269429 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269429 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
F21K9/00 (EP,US);
F21V29/70 (US);
F21K9/20 (EP,US);
F21V19/004 (EP,US);
F21V19/04 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
H01L23/4093 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | WÄRMELEITENDES MONTAGEELEMENT ZUR ANBRINGUNG EINER BESTÜCKTEN LEITERPLATTE AN EINEM KÜHLKÖRPER | [2011/01] | English: | THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE MOUNTING ELEMENT FOR ATTACHMENT OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD TO HEAT SINK | [2011/01] | French: | ELÉMENT DE MONTAGE THERMIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR PERMETTANT LA FIXATION D'UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ À UN DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 29.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2009 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MK | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | IE | 10.04.2012 | LU | 10.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
LU | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 10.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07326692 (AGING TESUTA KAIHATSU KYODO KU) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]US2003063441 (YAMAZAKI NAOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0160]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005259401 (HAN CHAN-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0070]; figures 4-9 *; | [A]US2006098441 (CHOU SHEN-HONG [TW]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-5B * |