EP2266438 - RELAXATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKAWA, Daisuke c/o Panasonic Int. Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 450-6207 / JP | 02 /
MICHIMORI, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Int. Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/50] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
MORIKAWA, Daisuke c/o PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO. LTD. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
MICHIMORI, Akihiro c/o PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO. LTD. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09732820.7 | 07.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009JP57094 | Priority number, date | JP20080108002 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008108002 | [2010/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128362 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2266438 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266438 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/02, A47C3/025, A61H23/02, A61M21/00, A61M21/02 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
A61M21/02 (EP);
A47C3/0255 (EP,US);
A47C3/0251 (EP,US);
A61H23/0263 (EP);
A61H2201/0149 (EP);
A61M2021/0022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | A47C3/02, A61H1/00, A61H7/00, A61M21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENTSPANNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/52] | English: | RELAXATION DEVICE | [2010/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RELAXATION | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2010 | Translation filed | 22.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2009 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GB | 07.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IE | 07.04.2016 | LU | 07.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 07.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6155976 (SACKNER MARVIN A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 6, line 66 - column 12, line 59; figures 1-8 *[I] 5 | International search | [Y]JPH11137626 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2001149164 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2001190677 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2007037832 (TAKEUCHI TECHNO CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000042112 |