EP2270338 - BLOWER AND HEAT PUMP DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/46] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yasuaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TADOKORO, Takahide c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/46] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
KATO, Yasuaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TADOKORO, Takahide c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/46] |
Former [2011/01] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734028.5 | 11.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009JP54645 | Priority number, date | JP20080111585 | 22.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008111585 | JP20080228399 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008228399 | [2011/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009130954 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2270338 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2270338 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/16, F04D29/52, F24F1/38, F24F1/40 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
F24F1/38 (EP,US);
F04D29/164 (EP,US);
F04D29/526 (EP,US);
F24F1/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | F04D29/54, F04D29/66, F24F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEBLÄSE UND WÄRMEPUMPENVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2011/01] | English: | BLOWER AND HEAT PUMP DEVICE USING SAME | [2011/01] | French: | SOUFFLANTE ET DISPOSITIF DE POMPE A CHALEUR L'UTILISANT | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2010 | Translation filed | 11.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2009 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IE | 11.03.2019 | LU | 11.03.2019 | MT | 11.03.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2009 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
MT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
MT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
MT | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 11.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS60251914 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1,2,6-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPH06167300 (KANDA KUCHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5342167 (ROSSEAU TODD D [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]DE19751042 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3-15; | [I]JP2775796B (NIPPON DENSO CO.) [I] 1,2,6-15 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [I]WO0196746 (BOSCH ROBERT CORP [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6-15 * abstract *; | [XDI]JP2003184797 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3,6,15; | [XI]EP1357337 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * [I] 3,6-15 | International search | [Y]JPS5284006U (AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH02242000 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JP2002089496 (JAPAN SERVO); | [Y]JP2002250298 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2004156553 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2005105865 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2007205664 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2769211B | JP3084790B | JP2003184797 |