EP2271027 - FORCE PROTECTION SWITCHING METHOD IN ETHERNET RING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-Dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-350 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-Dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Do-Yeon 508-303 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | 02 /
CHEUNG, Tae-Sik 107-603 Chonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Byungjun 807-1504, Yeolmae Maeul Apt. Noeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-768 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Bong Tae 131-405 Hanvit Apt. Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
KIM, Do-Yeon 508-303 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | ||
02 /
CHEUNG, Tae-Sik 107-603 Chonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | |||
03 /
AHN, Byungjun 807-1504, Yeolmae Maeul Apt. Noeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-768 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Bong Tae 131-405 Hanvit Apt. Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734259.6 | 22.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009KR02088 | Priority number, date | US20080046829P | 22.04.2008 Original published format: US 46829 P | KR20080130444 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: KR 20080130444 | KR20090031258 | 10.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090031258 | [2011/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009131369 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | KO | [2009/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2271027 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271027 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/437 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
H04L12/413 (EP,KR,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/437 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSCHUTZ-UMSCHALTVERFAHREN IN EINEM ETHERNET-RINGNETZWERK | [2011/01] | English: | FORCE PROTECTION SWITCHING METHOD IN ETHERNET RING NETWORK | [2011/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION FORCÉE DE PROTECTION DANS UN RÉSEAU ETHERNET EN BOUCLE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2010 | Translation filed | 22.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 07.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12150046.6 / EP2442493 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2009 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | HR | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | MC | 23.05.2012 | MK | 23.05.2012 | MT | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | NO | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 23.05.2012 | ||
MK | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
HR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | |
NO | 23.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001021177 (ISHII SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0128] *; | [I] - ITU-T Q9 - SG 15, "G.8032 Ethernet Ring Protection Overview", (200803), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/1/files/public/docs2008/liaison-itut-g8032-overview-0308.pdf, (20110316), XP002628431 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - Masahiro Maruyoshi, Pedro Nunes, "Draft ITU-T Recommendation G.8032/Y.1344 Ethernet Rings Protection Switching", International Telecommunication Union, no. TD 498 (PLEN/15), (20080222), pages 1 - 35, ITU, URL: http://www.itu.int/md/T05-SG15-080211-TD-PLEN-0498/en, (20110316), XP002628432 [I] 1-15 * Appendix III; page 29 - page 34 * | International search | [X] - CHIRUVOLU G. ET AL., "Issues and approaches on extending Ethernet beyond LANs.", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGANZINE, (20040301), vol. 42, no. ISS.3, pages 80 - 86, XP011108916 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2003.1267096 | [X] - LASSERRE M. ET AL., "Virtual Private LAN Service (VPLS) Using Label Distribution Protocol (LDP) Signaling.", NETWORKING WORKING GROUP, RFC4762, (20070101), XP008142962 | [A] - "Transmission and Multiplexing (TM); Optical Access Networks (OANs) for evolving services; ATM Passive Optical Networks (PONs) and the transport of ATM over digital subscriber lines.", ETSI STANDARD TS 101 272 V1.1.1, (19980601), XP014015940 |