EP2266557 - COMBINATION OF BENZOPHENONE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSING AGENT, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THESE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/52] | METHOD OF UTILIZATION OF COMBINATION OF BENZOPHENONE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSING AGENT, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THESE COMPONENTS | ||
[2013/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyama Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-5 Nishishinjuku 3-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIKAWA, Yukihiko c/o TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO. LTD. Toyama Works 4-1 Shimookui 2-Chome Toyama-Shi Toyama 930-8508 / JP | 02 /
SHIOZAWA, Shunichi 11-6 Takenodai 2-Chome Nishi-ku Kobe-Shi Hyogo 651-2274 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
AIKAWA, Yukihiko c/o TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO. LTD. Toyama Works 4-1 Shimookui 2-Chome Toyama-Shi Toyama 930-8508 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOZAWA, Shunichi 11-6 Takenodai 2-Chome Nishi-ku Kobe-Shi Hyogo 651-2274 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09735250.4 | 20.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009JP57860 | Priority number, date | JP20080111295 | 22.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008111295 | [2010/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131098 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2266557 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266557 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/194, A61K31/42, A61K31/423, A61K31/519, A61K31/5377, A61K31/573, A61K45/06, A61P29/00, A61P37/06, A61P43/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/423 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/194, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/423, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS EINEM BENZOPHENONDERIVAT ODER EINEM SALZ DARAUS UND EINEM IMMUNSUPPRESSIVEN WIRKSTOFF SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DIESEN KOMPONENTEN | [2013/09] | English: | COMBINATION OF BENZOPHENONE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSING AGENT, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THESE COMPONENTS | [2013/09] | French: | COMBINAISON D'UN DÉRIVÉ DE BENZOPHÉNONE OU D'UN SEL DE CELUI-CI ET D'UN AGENT IMMUNOSUPPRESSEUR, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT CES COMPOSANTS | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINATION AUS EINEM BENZOPHENONDERIVAT ODER EINEM SALZ DARAUS UND EINEM IMMUNSUPPRESSIVEN WIRKSTOFF SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DIESEN KOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [2010/52] | METHOD OF UTILIZATION OF COMBINATION OF BENZOPHENONE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSING AGENT, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THESE COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2010/52] | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UNE COMBINAISON D'UN DÉRIVÉ DE BENZOPHÉNONE OU D'UN SEL DE CELUI-CI ET D'UN AGENT IMMUNOSUPPRESSEUR, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT CES COMPOSANTS | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2010 | Translation filed | 06.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 31.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1445249 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1,8 * * page 9, paragraph 0035 *; | [Y]WO2007138997 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y] - KROOT ERIC-JAN A ET AL, "Oral pulsed dexamethasone therapy in early rheumatoid arthritis: a pilot study.", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES JUN 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16855157, (200606), vol. 1069, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 300 - 306, XP002656569 [Y] 1-16 * page 300, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/annals.1351.028 | [Y] - RAVELLI A ET AL, "Radiologic progression in patients with juvenile chronic arthritis treated with methotrexate", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 133, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3476, (19980801), pages 262 - 265, (19980801), XP027398734 [Y] 1-16 * page 262, column l, paragraph 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2003040776 (SANKYO CO); | [Y]WO03042150 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004501147 (ATHEROGENICS, INC.); | [Y]JP2007500223 (WYETH); | [YP] - AIKAWA Y ET AL., "Treatment of arthritis with a selective inhibitor of c-Fos/activator protein-1", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200807), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 817 - 823, XP008141319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1412 | by applicant | WO03042150 | - BERTRAM G KATZUNG, Basic & Clinical Pharmacology, MCGRAW-HILL COMPANIES, (2004), pages 940 - 950 | - THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 334, pages 1287 - 1291 | - W GREENE ET AL., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (1999), pages 369 - 453 | - W GREENE ET AL., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (1999), pages 494 - 615 | - W GREENE ET AL., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (1999), pages 17 - 245 |