EP2290297 - HUMIDITY CONTROLLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg. 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Hiroki c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Yasunori c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
NODA, Hiroshi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09735589.5 | 21.04.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP01812 | Priority number, date | JP20080110604 | 21.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008110604 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009130885 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290297 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/147, B01D53/26, F24F11/02 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
F24F3/1411 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/0454 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,KR,US);
F24F3/1429 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/106 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSREGELSYSTEM | [2011/09] | English: | HUMIDITY CONTROLLING SYSTEM | [2011/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION D HUMIDITÉ | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2010 | Translation filed | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2428885 (LUACES ENRIQUE L) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,6 *; | [Y]EP1736711 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0125]; figures 18-24 *; | [A]JP2004278943 (GAS & POWER KK, et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1630482 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0175]; claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2004060954 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2005291700 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2001033155 (AIR WATER INC) | by applicant | JP2004060954 |