EP2407017 - MECHANICAL MOVEMENTS ADJUSTED BY ELECTROMAGNETIC PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buendia, José 100, rue des Patiers Serezin de la Tour 38300 Bourgoin-Jallieu / FR | For all designated states Perrichon, Claude Annie 6, rue des Escoffiers 38080 L'Isle d'Abeau / FR | For all designated states Piccaluga, Pierre 113 route de Lausanne 1197 Prangins / CH | For all designated states Giry, François 212 Route de Saint Baldoph 73190 Challes les Eaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Buendia, José 100, rue des Patiers Serezin de la Tour 38300 Bourgoin-Jallieu / FR | ||
For all designated states Perrichon, Claude Annie 6, rue des Escoffiers 38080 L'Isle d'Abeau / FR | |||
For all designated states Piccaluga, Pierre 113 route de Lausanne 1197 Prangins / CH | |||
For all designated states Giry, François 212 Route de Saint Baldoph 73190 Challes les Eaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Delprat, Olivier Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Delprat, Olivier Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737014.2 | 14.08.2009 | WO2009FR01006 | Priority number, date | WO2009FR00259 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: PCT/FR2009/000259 | WO2009FR00599 | 25.05.2009 Original published format: PCT/FR2009/000599 | WO2009FR00936 | 28.07.2009 Original published format: PCT/FR2009/000936 | [2012/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010103194 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2407017 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00, B64C23/00, F15D1/06, H04R23/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H04R23/00 (EP,KR,US);
H05K9/00 (KR);
B64C23/00 (KR);
F15D1/06 (KR);
G01M1/36 (EP,US);
Y02B10/30 (EP,US);
Y02P80/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | DURCH ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE SONDE JUSTIERTE MECHANISCHE UHRWERKE | [2012/03] | English: | MECHANICAL MOVEMENTS ADJUSTED BY ELECTROMAGNETIC PROBE | [2012/03] | French: | MOUVEMENTS MECANIQUES REGULES PAR PALPEURS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2013 | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2869754 (GIRY FRANCOIS [FR]; PERRICHON CLAUDE ANNIE [FR]; PICCALUGA PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007141395 (PERRICHON CLAUDE ANNIE [FR]; GIRY FRANCOIS [FR]; PICCALUGA PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0108446 (PICA SOUND INTERNAT [FR]; CHARBONNAUX MARC [FR]; MORCHAIN PATRICE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008029002 (PICCALUGA PIERRE [FR]; GAUTHIER GILLES [FR]; PERRICHON CLAUDE ANNIE [F) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2858098 (PICCALUGA PIERRE [FR]; GIRY FRANCOIS [FR]; PERRICHON CLAUDE ANNIE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9951452 (MCNEELY P DENNIS [US]) [A] 3 * the whole document * |