EP2282691 - ANCHOR FOR USE WITH ORTHOPEDIC SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lewis, Stephen J. 568 Fairlawn Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5M 1V6 / CA | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 09737587.7 | 28.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009CA00570 | Priority number, date | US20080048305P | 28.04.2008 Original published format: US 48305 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009132445 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282691 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/86, A61B17/70 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/686 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | ANKER FÜR EINE ORTHOPÄDISCHE SCHRAUBE | [2011/07] | English: | ANCHOR FOR USE WITH ORTHOPEDIC SCREW | [2011/07] | French: | ANCRE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE AVEC UNE VIS ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4657456 (ANQUETIN ROBERT [FR]); | [Y]US4716893 (FISCHER ARTUR [DE], et al); | [Y]US5084050 (DRAENERT KLAUS [DE]) |