EP2268853 - EQUIPMENT FOR THE STRAIGHTENING OF DEFORMED ELECTROLYSIS POTSHELLS, IN PARTICULAR FOR ALUMINIUM MOLTEN-BATH ELECTROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec OYJ Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGEL, Hardy Anton-Ockenfels-Strasse 37 50321 Brühl / DE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Christl, Hermann Patentanwalt Pohlhausenstrasse 52 53332 Bornheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Christl, Hermann Patentanwalt, Pohlhausenstrasse 52 53332 Bornheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Christl, Hermann Patentanwalt, Pohlhausenstrasse 52 53332 Bornheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737791.5 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP02449 | Priority number, date | DE20081021652 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021652 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009132747 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268853 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268853 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08, B21D1/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C25C3/08 (EP,US);
B21D1/10 (EP,US);
C25C7/06 (EP,US);
Y10S72/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEGRADIGUNG VERFORMTER ELEKTROLYSE-WANNEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE ALUMINIUMSCHMELZBAD-ELEKTROLYSE | [2011/01] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR THE STRAIGHTENING OF DEFORMED ELECTROLYSIS POTSHELLS, IN PARTICULAR FOR ALUMINIUM MOLTEN-BATH ELECTROLYSIS | [2011/01] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT PERMETTANT DE RAIDIR LES CREUSETS D'ÉLECTROLYSE DÉFORMÉS, EN PARTICULIER DANS L'ÉLECTROLYSE À BAIN D'ALUMINIUM EN FUSION | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2009 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HR | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MK | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 03.04.2012 | LU | 03.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
LU | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1070215 ; | [A]FR1447433 (PECHINEY PROD CHIMIQUES SA) [A] 1* page 3; claims 1-11 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 38, Database accession no. 1984-236604, XP002534028 & SU1070215 A 19840130 (IRKUT ALUM MAGN ELE) [A] 1 * abstract * |