EP2274029 - MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARMS, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
RAAB, Steffen c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
WEBBER, Dominic, George 124 Blinco Grove Cambridge CB1 7TT / GB | 04 /
HOWARTH, James, Robert 5 Rose and Crown Yard Willingham Cambridge CB4 5ER / GB | 05 /
BECKETT, Trevor, John 6 Conder Close Milton Cambridge CB4 6DZ / GB | 06 /
GRAY, Geoffrey, Philip 14 George St Berkhamsted Herts HP4 2EG / GB | 07 /
CROSS, John, David 200 Allesley Old Road Coventry CV5 8GJ / GB | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
HARMS, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02 /
RAAB, Steffen c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03 /
WEBBER, Dominic, George 124 Blinco Grove Cambridge CB1 7TT / GB | |||
04 /
HOWARTH, James, Robert 5 Rose and Crown Yard Willingham Cambridge CB4 5ER / GB | |||
05 /
BECKETT, Trevor, John 6 Conder Close Milton Cambridge CB4 6DZ / GB | |||
06 /
GRAY, Geoffrey, Philip 14 George St Berkhamsted Herts HP4 2EG / GB | |||
07 /
CROSS, John, David 200 Allesley Old Road Coventry CV5 8GJ / GB | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 09737821.0 | 17.04.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP02806 | Priority number, date | EP20080008353 | 02.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08008353 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009132777 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274029 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274029 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/315 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61M5/31511 (EP,US);
A61M5/31576 (US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31533 (US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31541 (EP,US);
A61M5/31543 (EP,US);
A61M5/3155 (US);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M5/31583 (US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
A61M5/31593 (US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2202/04 (US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | AL | 02.12.2010 | BA | 02.12.2010 | RS | 02.12.2010 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2011/03] | English: | MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE | [2011/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0554996 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [DA] 1,29 * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 22; figures 7,8 *; | [DA]US5827232 (CHANOCH LAWRENCE H [US], et al) [DA] 1,29 * abstract *; | [A]US6235004 (STEENFELDT-JENSEN SOEREN [DK], et al) [A] 1,29* abstract *; | [A]WO2007006662 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,29 * abstract * |