EP2268627 - PAPER SIZING ADDITIVES, THEIR PREPARATION PROCESS, AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Aaldert, Johannes Vincent van Goghstraat 6 NL-3781 XN Voorthuizen / NL | 02 /
WERNER, Martin Josef-Zilken-Str. 57 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 03 /
STRUCK, Oliver Schmiedstrasse 12 91239 Henfenfeld / DE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Alferink, Petrus J.T. Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal, IP & Compliance P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Alferink, Petrus J.T. Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal, IP & Compliance P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2011/01] | Alferink, Petrus J.T. Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal, IP & Compliance P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 09738065.3 | 24.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP54931 | Priority number, date | EP20080155398 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08155398 | US20080053582P | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 53582 P | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133021 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268627 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268627 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/60 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07D307/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | PAPIERLEIMUNGSZUSÄTZE, DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | [2011/01] | English: | PAPER SIZING ADDITIVES, THEIR PREPARATION PROCESS, AND THEIR USE | [2011/01] | French: | ADDITIFS D'ENCOLLAGE DE PAPIER, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | HR | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MK | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | IE | 24.04.2012 | LU | 24.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3405196 (WOLFF WILLIAM F) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 5; examples 1,5; claim 5 * * column 2, lines 16-29 *; | [Y]US3928485 (NAGASE TSUNEYUKI, et al) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16 * Examples;; column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 52; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0190352 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 5; examples 4,10,11; claim 1 * * page 5, lines 14-16 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]US5021169 (SHIN KJU H [US], et al) [A] 4,5* column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 13; example 4; claim 1 *; | [YX]WO0079050 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14-16 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 23; examples 1-3 * [X] 12-14; | [XY]EP1424322 (CHEVRON ORONITE CO [US]) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0053]; claims 1,5,33 * * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0043] , [0100] , [0109] * [Y] 1-3,6-11,15,16; | [X] - S. H. NAHM, H. N. CHENG, "Transition-state geometry and stereochemistry of the ene reaction between olefins and maleic anhydride", J. ORG. CHEM, (1986), vol. 51, pages 5093 - 5100, XP002502657 [X] 12,13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00376a008 |