EP2282778 - NEW THERAPEUTIC APPROACHES FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS THROUGH A MODULATION OF ANGIOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharnext 11, rue des Peupliers 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states Pharnext 11 Rue des Peupliers 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Pharnext Pépinière Santé Cochin 29, rue du Faubourg Saint Jacques 75014 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Daniel 132 Rue des Tennerolles 92210 Saint Cloud / FR | 02 /
CHUMAKOV, Ilya 691 rue de la Noue 77000 Vaux LePenil / FR | 03 /
NABIROCHKIN, Serguei 49 avenue de Sully Prud'homme 92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | 04 /
GUERASSIMENKO, Oxana Appt 122 12, ul Solnechnaya Troïsk 142 190 / RU | 05 /
GRAUDENS, Esther 36 Rue de la Condamine 75017 Paris / FR | [2017/10] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
COHEN, Daniel 61 avenue des Courlis F-78110 Le Vésinet / FR | ||
02 /
CHUMAKOV, Ilya 691 rue de la Noue F-77000 Vaux LePenil / FR | |||
03 /
NABIROCHKIN, Serguei 49 avenue de Sully Prud'homme F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | |||
04 /
GUERASSIMENKO, Oxana 22 rue de la Forêt F-91490 Milly-la-Forêt / FR | |||
05 /
GRAUDENS, Esther 36 Rue de la Condamine F-75017 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/07] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09738185.9 | 29.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009EP55205 | Priority number, date | US20080048583P | 29.04.2008 Original published format: US 48583 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009133141 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282778 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282778 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K31/195, A61K31/37, A61K31/42, A61K31/4365, A61K31/55, A61K31/64, A61P25/28 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/37 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/4365 (EP,US);
A61K31/64 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/37, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4365, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2011/07] | A61K45/06, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUE THERAPEUTISCHE ANSÄTZE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER-KRANKHEIT UND VERWANDTER ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH MODULATION DER ANGIOGENESE | [2011/07] | English: | NEW THERAPEUTIC APPROACHES FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS THROUGH A MODULATION OF ANGIOGENESIS | [2011/07] | French: | NOUVELLES APPROCHES THÉRAPEUTIQUES POUR TRAITER LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET LES TROUBLES QUI LUI SONT ASSOCIÉS PAR MODULATION DE L'ANGIOGENÈSE | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2016 | 13.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | DE FR GB | Date: | 26.04.2016 | [2016/23] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03061767 (ATOPIC PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-20 * claims 23, 24, 26 *; | [X] - CRYSTAL H A, "Baclofen therapy may be associated with chorea in Alzheimer's disease.", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY DEC 1990, (199012), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0364-5134, page 839, XP009024224 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - LEE JAEWON ET AL, "Phenformin suppresses calcium responses to glutamate and protects hippocampal neurons against excitotoxicity", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020501), vol. 175, no. 1, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 161 - 167, XP002538106 [X] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/EXNR.2002.7864 | [A] - DELAGARZA V, "Pharmacologic Treatment of Alzheimer's Disease: An Update", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS.; US, (20031001), vol. 68, no. 7, ISSN 0002-838X, pages 1365 - 1372, XP008091098 [A] 1-20 * table 1 * | [A] - VAGNUCCI A H ET AL, "Alzheimer's disease and angiogenesis", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20030215), vol. 361, no. 9357, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 605 - 608, XP004778573 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)12521-4 | Examination | - MCKHANN G ET AL, "CLINICAL DIAGNOSIS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE: REPORT OF THE NINCDS-ADRDA WORK GROUP UNDER THE AUSPICES OF DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES TASK FORCE ON ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19840701), vol. 34, no. 7, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 939 - 944, XP000671871 |