EP2290631 - ALARMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOCHIKI CORPORATION 10-43, Kamiosaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8660 / JP | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGAWA, Yoshitaka c/o HOCHIKI CORPORATION 10-43 Kamiosaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8660 / JP | 02 /
SHIMA, Hiroshi c/o HOCHIKI CORPORATION 10-43 Kamiosaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8660 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
EGAWA, Yoshitaka c/o HOCHIKI CORPORATION 10-43 Kamiosaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8660 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMA, Hiroshi c/o HOCHIKI CORPORATION 10-43 Kamiosaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8660 / JP | Representative(s) | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/09] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09738714.6 | 17.04.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP57771 | Priority number, date | JP20080119583 | 01.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008119583 | JP20080128182 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008128182 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133777 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290631 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290631 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10, G08B17/00, G08B23/00, G08B29/18, G08B7/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G08B7/06 (EP,US);
G08B17/00 (EP,US);
G08B25/009 (EP,US);
G08B29/181 (EP,US);
G08B17/113 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | G08B25/10, G08B17/00, G08B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | ALARMIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/09] | English: | ALARMING DEVICE | [2011/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D' ALARME | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2010 | Translation filed | 27.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12158573.1 / EP2463840 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2009 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MK | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07273721 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH1155176 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0012] - [0025] *; | [Y]JP2006270505 (NOHMI BOSAI LTD) [Y] 6* paragraphs [0003] , [0008] - [0013] - [0025] - [0038]; figure 4 *; | [Y]JP2007094719 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0011] - [0043] * | International search | [Y]JPH07273721 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPH1155176 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2005292969 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2006173691 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2006270505 (NOHMI BOSAI LTD); | [Y]JP2008042383 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | US2006128414 | by applicant | JP2007094719 | JP2008119583 | JP2008128182 |