EP2274108 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURING A CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/03] | METHODS OF MANUFACTURING CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCER AND CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCERS | ||
[2013/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Chienliu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2013/52] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
CHANG, Chienliu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2011/03] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09738898.7 | 28.04.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009JP58720 | Priority number, date | JP20080120391 | 02.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008120391 | JP20090057263 | 11.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009057263 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133961 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274108 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274108 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02, B81B3/00, B81C1/00 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
B81C1/00476 (EP,US);
B81B2201/038 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0127 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0315 (EP,US);
B81B2203/04 (EP,US);
B81C2201/0114 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | B06B1/02, B81B3/00, H01L21/306 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KAPAZITIVEN ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN WANDLERS | [2013/29] | English: | METHODS OF MANUFACTURING A CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCER | [2013/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE TRANSDUCTEURS ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUES CAPACITIFS | [2013/29] |
Former [2011/03] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KAPAZITIVEN ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN WANDLERS UND KAPAZITIVER ELEKTROMECHANISCHER WANDLER | ||
Former [2011/03] | METHODS OF MANUFACTURING CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCER AND CAPACITIVE ELECTROMECHANICAL TRANSDUCERS | ||
Former [2011/03] | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE TRANSDUCTEURS ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUES CAPACITIFS ET TRANSDUCTEURS ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUES CAPACITIFS | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2009 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | GB | 28.04.2014 | IE | 28.04.2014 | LU | 28.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | FR | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.04.2009 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.04.2009 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AYX]WO2006092820 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1-10,15-17 * page 12, line 22 - page 14, line 15; figures 6-19 * [Y] 12 [X] 11,13,14; | [AX]EP1382565 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-10,15-17 * paragraphs [0115] - [0121]; figures 7-13 * [X] 11,13,14; | [AY]EP1098719 (QINETIQ LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10,15-17 * paragraphs [0030] , [0059]; figures 4,5 * [Y] 12; | [A]GB849477 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1-10,15-17 * page 2, line 90 - page 3, line 4; figure 1 * | by applicant | US6426582 | JP2005027186 | JPH06216111 | - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS, AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (200512), vol. 52, no. 12, pages 2242 - 2258 |