EP2268956 - CONNECTOR GASKET FOR CONCRETE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S & B Technical Products, Inc. 1300 East Berry Street Forth Worth, TX 76119 / US | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBETT, Bradford, G., Jr. 1300 East Berry Street Fort Worth TX 76119 / US | 02 /
CHINCHILLA, Randall Urb. Clarava 158 El Carmen De Guadalupe San Jose Costa Rica / CR | 03 /
LOPEZ, Bernal De Mabe 150m Oeste Tapia Blanca Con Arco San Pablo Heredia / CR | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Lecomte, Didier, et al Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Lecomte, Didier, et al Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O.Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 09739177.5 | 29.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009US02614 | Priority number, date | US20080112585 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 112585 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009134374 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268956 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/02, F16L17/00, H02G15/013, E03F5/02, F16L5/10, F16L41/00 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
E03F5/02 (EP,US);
E03F5/021 (EP,US);
F16L41/002 (EP,US);
F16L5/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | F16L21/02, F16L17/00, H02G15/013 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | KONNEKTORDICHTUNG FÜR BETONSTRUKTUREN | [2011/01] | English: | CONNECTOR GASKET FOR CONCRETE STRUCTURES | [2011/01] | French: | JOINT D ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE CONNECTEUR POUR STRUCTURES EN BÉTON | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4903970 (DITCHER JACK [US], et al) [A] 1-4* figures 1,2,2A,4A,5 *; | [Y]US5431459 (GUNDY WILLIAM P [US]) [Y] 4 * figures 4,7 *; | [XY]US2006082141 (CORBETT BRADFORD G JR [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0023] , [0034] , [0035] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 1,1A,5 * [Y] 4 | International search | [Y]US2884042 (SEATON JOHN H); | [Y]US4103901 (DITCHER JOHN); | [Y]US2006082141 (CORBETT BRADFORD G JR [US]) |