EP2240939 - A METHODOLOGY FOR MODELING THE FUEL ROD POWER DISTRIBUTION WITHIN A NUCLEAR REACTOR CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Cranberry Township, Pennsylvania 16066 / US | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Baocheng 4109 Tartan Court Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
ZHANG, Baocheng 4109 Tartan Court Murrysville PA 15668 / US | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09739300.3 | 05.02.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009US33160 | Priority number, date | US20080029005 | 11.02.2008 Original published format: US 29005 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134498 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2240939 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G21C5/00, G21C17/00, G21D3/00, G06F9/50 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G21C17/00 (EP);
G21C5/00 (EP);
G21D3/001 (EP);
G21D3/002 (EP);
Y02E30/00 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | G21C17/10, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | METHODOLOGIE ZUR MODELLIERUNG DER BRENNSTAB-LEISTUNGSVERTEILUNG IN EINEM NUKLEARREAKTORKERN | [2010/42] | English: | A METHODOLOGY FOR MODELING THE FUEL ROD POWER DISTRIBUTION WITHIN A NUCLEAR REACTOR CORE | [2010/42] | French: | MÉTHODOLOGIE POUR LA MODÉLISATION DE LA DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE DE BARRES DE COMBUSTIBLE À L'INTÉRIEUR DU C UR D UN RÉACTEUR NUCLÉAIRE | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 29.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006184286 (BOER RAINER [DE], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040] *; | [A]US2001026603 (HIRUKAWA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0164] - [0209] *; | [A]US4333797 (NISHIZAWA YASUO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 28 * | [A] - IWAMOTO AND M YAMAMOTO T, "Pin Power Reconstruction Methods of the Few-Group BWR Core Simulator NEREUS", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATOMIC ENERGY SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, (19991201), vol. 36, no. 12, ISSN 0022-3131, pages 1141 - 1152, XP008139286 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * sections I-III * | International search | [Y]US2006184286 (BOER RAINER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2004096101 (MORI MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004022342 (MAGILL JOSEPH [DE], et al); | [A]US2005135547 (SCHULZ WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]US4774050 (IMPINK JR ALBERT J [US]) | [Y] - IWAMOTO ET AL., "Pin Power Reconstruction Methods of the Few-Group BWR Core Simulator NEREUS", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 36, no. 12, (199912), URL: http://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/jnsU36/12/1141/_pdf, (20090908), XP008139286 |