EP2269430 - INTERLOCKING EMI SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYERS, Scott 1 Infinite 2006 Cupertion, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
WANG, Erik 1 Infinite 2006 Coupertion, CA 95014 / US | [2011/02] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
MYERS, Scott 1 Infinite 2006 Cupertion CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
WANG, Erik 1 Infinite 2006 Coupertion CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Gillard, Matthew Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Gillard, Matthew Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2011/01] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739361.5 | 26.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009US38421 | Priority number, date | US20080112729 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 112729 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009134559 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269430 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269430 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H05K9/0032 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49876 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EMI-VERRIEGELABSCHIRMUNG | [2013/09] | English: | INTERLOCKING EMI SHIELD | [2011/01] | French: | ELÉMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES INTERFÉRENCES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES À VERROUILLAGE | [2011/01] |
Former [2011/01] | VERZAHNTE EMI-ABSCHIRMUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 19.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2009 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BE | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | IT | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | IE | 26.03.2016 | LU | 26.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 26.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1061789 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,10-20 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 3a,4 *; | [A]DE19633354 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 21 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2003169583 (WATANABE YOSHIKIYO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US6320121 |