EP2276506 - POTENT CONJUGATES AND HYDROPHILIC LINKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunogen, Inc. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Rajeeva 40 Lanewood Avenue Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
KOVTUN, Yelena 7 Elaine Avenue Stow, MA 01775 / US | 03 /
WILHELM, Sharon, D. 45 Carlton Street 7 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 04 /
CHARI, Ravi, V., J. 174 Winchester Street Newton, MA 02461 / US | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
SINGH, Rajeeva 40 Lanewood Avenue Framingham MA 01701 / US | ||
02 /
KOVTUN, Yelena 7 Elaine Avenue Stow MA 01775 / US | |||
03 /
WILHELM, Sharon, D. 45 Carlton Street 7 Brookline MA 02446 / US | |||
04 /
CHARI, Ravi, V., J. 174 Winchester Street Newton MA 02461 / US | Representative(s) | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739778.0 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009US42259 | Priority number, date | US20080049289P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 49289 P | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009134976 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276506 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/5386 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/537 (KR);
A61K31/40 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/6843 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61K47/6863 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6889 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6891 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P33/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP,KR);
C07D498/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | BA | 09.11.2010 | RS | 09.11.2010 | Title | German: | WIRKUNGSSTARKE KONJUGATE UND HYDROPHILE BINDER | [2011/04] | English: | POTENT CONJUGATES AND HYDROPHILIC LINKERS | [2011/04] | French: | CONJUGUÉS PUISSANTS ET COUPLEURS HYDROPHILES | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 31.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02083030 (CRYOLIFE INC [US]); | [X]WO02087497 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | [XD]US6596757 (CHARI RAVI V J [US], et al); | [X]WO2005012484 (NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [XD]US2005276812 (EBENS ALLEN J JR [US], et al); | [X]WO2007100385 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007112193 (IMMUNONOMEDICS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007140371 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009012256 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2003220245 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [CH], et al); | [Y]US2005169933 (STEEVES RITA [US], et al); | [A]US2006127352 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [CH], et al) |