EP2293874 - METAL UTILIZATION IN SUPPORTED, METAL-CONTAINING CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology LLC 800 North Lindbergh Blvd. St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Kam-To C/o Monsanto Company Patent Dept: (E2NA) 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Office Hanssens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Bosch, Henry, et al Office Hanssens Colens Square Marie-Louise, 40 bte 19 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 09739952.1 | 01.05.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US42562 | Priority number, date | US20080049465 | 01.05.2008 Original published format: US 49465 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009135150 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293874 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/56, C07F9/38, B01J35/00, B01J35/10, B01J23/62, B01J23/89, B01J21/18, B01J37/02 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B01J35/393 (EP);
B01J23/56 (EP);
B01J23/626 (EP);
B01J23/8906 (EP);
B01J23/8913 (EP);
B01J23/8926 (EP);
B01J35/30 (EP);
B01J35/392 (EP);
B01J35/397 (EP);
B01J35/617 (EP);
B01J37/0018 (EP);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
C07C227/02 (EP);
C07F9/3813 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP);
B01J35/66 (EP);
B01J37/0205 (EP);
B01J37/0211 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | METALLVERWENDUNG IN GETRÄGERTEN, METALLHALTIGEN KATALYSATOREN | [2011/11] | English: | METAL UTILIZATION IN SUPPORTED, METAL-CONTAINING CATALYSTS | [2011/11] | French: | UTILISATION DE MÉTAL DANS DES CATALYSEURS SUPPORTÉS CONTENANT UN MÉTAL | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 22.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US2002016503 (LEIBER MARK A [US], et al) [DX] 1-10,12-31,52,57,58,61-63,65,67,68 * example - *; | [DX]US6417133 (EBNER JERRY R [US], et al) [DX] 1-10,12-31,52,57,58,61-63,65,67,68* example - *; | [DX]WO2006031938 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [DX] 1-10,12-31,52,57,58,61-63,65,67,68 * example - * |