EP2379801 - SHEET-FORMING SYSTEM FOR A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER FIBROUS MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄUssLER, Markus Holzwiese 2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 02 /
FENKL, Konstantin Baumstrasse 29 89547 Gerstetten-Heldenfingen / DE | 03 /
RUF, Wolfgang Wedelstr. 3/2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 04 /
PRÖSSL, Jürgen Happenweiler 402 88263 Horgenzell / DE | 05 /
SCHWANER, Mathias Bischof-Sproll-Weg 9 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
HÄUssLER, Markus Holzwiese 2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | ||
02 /
FENKL, Konstantin Baumstrasse 29 89547 Gerstetten-Heldenfingen / DE | |||
03 /
RUF, Wolfgang Wedelstr. 3/2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 09740129.3 | 22.10.2009 | WO2009EP63884 | Priority number, date | EP20080171763 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08171763 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069654 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2379801 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2379801 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/02, D21F9/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
D21F1/02 (EP,US);
D21F1/028 (EP,US);
D21F9/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | D21F1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | BLATTBILDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN FASERSTOFFBAHN | [2011/43] | English: | SHEET-FORMING SYSTEM FOR A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER FIBROUS MATERIAL WEB | [2011/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MISE EN BANDE DESTINÉ À UNE MACHINE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BANDE DE MATIÈRE FIBREUSE MULTICOUCHE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MK | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | SM | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
SM | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
SM | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | HR | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | HR | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | HR | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19538149 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,4,11-12,14-15* the whole document *; | [A]US6139687 (BEUTHER PAUL D [US]) [A] 1-2,5-6,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1881106 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-6,11-12,15 * the whole document * |