EP2340683 - REMOTE ANTENNA INSTALLATION FOR A PLURALITY OF BASE STATIONS SHARING A SINGLE HF SUPPLY LINE FOR TRANSMITTING HF, CONTROL AND MONITORING SIGNALS AND THE SUPPLY DIRECT VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEOR, Alexander Aiblinger Au 30 83059 Kobermoor / DE | 02 /
MOHR, Markus Innstrasse 48 83022 Rosenheim / DE | 03 /
GABRIEL, Roland Sperberweg 11 83556 Griesstätt / DE | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09740861.1 | 22.10.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009EP07574 | Priority number, date | DE20081053850 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008053850 | DE20091015050 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009015050 | [2011/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010049094 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340683 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2340683 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04B7/2041 (US);
H01Q1/288 (US);
H04B1/0053 (KR);
H04W40/06 (KR);
H04B1/48 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | ABGESETZTE ANTENNENANLAGE FÜR MEHRERE BASISSTATIONEN, DIE SICH EINE EINZIGE HF-SPEISELEITUNG TEILEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG DER HF-, KONTROLL- UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSIGNALE SOWIE DER VERSORGUNGSGLEICHSPANNUNG | [2011/27] | English: | REMOTE ANTENNA INSTALLATION FOR A PLURALITY OF BASE STATIONS SHARING A SINGLE HF SUPPLY LINE FOR TRANSMITTING HF, CONTROL AND MONITORING SIGNALS AND THE SUPPLY DIRECT VOLTAGE | [2011/27] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ANTENNE À DISTANCE POUR PLUSIEURS STATIONS DE BASE SE PARTAGEANT UNE SEULE LIGNE D'ALIMENTATION HF POUR LA TRANSMISSION DES SIGNAUX DE HAUTE FREQUENCE, DE COMMANDE ET DE SURVEILLANCE AINSI QUE DE LA TENSION CONTINUE D'ALIMENTATION | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/27] | INSTALLATION D'ANTENNE À DISTANCE POUR PLUSIEURS STATIONS DE BASE SE PARTAGEANT UNE SEULE LIGNE D'ALIMENTATION HF POUR LA TRANSMISSION DES SIGNAUX DE HAUTE FRÉQNEUCE, DE COMMANDE ET DE SURVEILLANCE AINSI QUE TENSION CONTINUE D'ALIMENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | HR | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | MK | 28.11.2012 | MT | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | SM | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | NO | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 28.11.2012 | |
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | HR | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | HR | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | HR | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
NO | 28.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1085773 (NORTEL MATRA CELLULAR [FR]) [Y] 2-7,9-19,21-28 * paragraphs [0014] , [0045] , [0055] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0059] - [0063] * * paragraphs [0066] , [0073] , [0074] * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] * * figures 6,11 *[A] 1,8,20; | [XY]US2002132644 (MELLOR SIMON [GB], et al) [X] 1,8,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0048] * * figures 4,5 * [Y] 2-7,9-19,21-28; | [YA]US6618599 (SON O SUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 2-7,9-19,21-28 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 62 * * column 3, line 22 - line 38 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 56 * * column 8, line 1 - line 5 * * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 49 * * figure 4 * [A] 1,8,20 | by applicant | EP1085773 | US2002132644 | US6618599 | EP1455413 | EP1356539 |