EP2328824 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POSITIONING CONTAINERS AND PLANT FOR TREATING CONTAINERS HAVING DIFFERENT CROSS SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERAC GROUP Route de Mamers 72400 La Ferté-Bernard / FR | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOURLAOUEN, Xavier 50 rue de Bazeilles F-72000 Le Mans / FR | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 5 rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09741343.9 | 28.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009FR01144 | Priority number, date | FR20080005417 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0805417 | [2011/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037924 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328824 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328824 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/24, B67C7/00, B65G47/86 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
B65G47/847 (EP,US);
B67C3/242 (EP,US);
B67C7/0053 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | B65G47/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2011/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON BEHÄLTERN UND ANLAGE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN QUERSCHNITTEN | [2011/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POSITIONING CONTAINERS AND PLANT FOR TREATING CONTAINERS HAVING DIFFERENT CROSS SECTIONS | [2011/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DE RECIPIENTS ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE RECIPIENTS AYANT DES SECTIONS DIFFERENTES | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2009 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | IE | 28.09.2015 | LU | 28.09.2015 | GB | 22.10.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.09.2009 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0659683 (IMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5,16 * columns 2,6,7,8; figures 1-21 *; | [A]EP1041034 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,16 * columns 1-5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005103605 (HARTNESS THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1,5,16* pages 2-4,7,9; figures 1-36 * |