EP2212563 - SELF-POWERED PUMP FOR HEATED LIQUID, FLUID HEATING AND STORAGE TANK AND FLUID HEATING SYSTEM EMPLOYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W&E International (Canada) Corp. 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | For all designated states LIN, Huazi 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, ON L4S 1H2 / CA | [2013/01] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states W&E International (Canada) Corp. 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | ||
For all designated states Lin, Huazi 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, ON L4S 1H2 / CA | |||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Huazi, Lin 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, ON L4S 1H2 / CA | ||
For all designated states W&E International (Canada) Corp. 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill, Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Huazi 66 Devonsleigh Blvd. Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
LIN, Huazi 66 Devonsleigh Blvd., Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | ||
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
HUAZI, Lin 66 Devonsleigh Blvd., Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1H2 / CA | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Tomkinson, Alexandra, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 5 York Place Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Hemingway, Christopher Paul Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 5 York Place Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09741628.3 | 07.05.2009 | [2010/31] | WO2009CA00631 | Priority number, date | CA20082628605 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: CA 2628605 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135310 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2212563 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212563 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04F1/14, F04F10/02, F24H1/08, F24H1/18, F24H7/04, F24J2/30, F24J2/44 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
F04B17/006 (EP,US);
F24D11/003 (EP,US);
F24D17/0021 (EP,US);
F24D19/082 (EP,US);
F24H1/208 (EP,US);
F24H9/133 (EP,US);
F24S60/30 (EP);
F24S90/10 (EP);
F28D20/0034 (EP,US);
F24D2200/14 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0078 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0086 (EP,US);
F28F2250/08 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US);
Y02E70/30 (EP,US);
Y02P80/10 (EP,US);
Y02P90/50 (EP);
Y10T137/27 (EP,US);
Y10T137/272 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2788 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | SELBSTBETRIEBENE PUMPE FÜR ERHITZTE FLÜSSIGKEITEN, FLÜSSIGKEITSERWÄRMUNG- UND -AUFBEWAHRUNGSTANK UND FLÜSSIGKEITSERWÄRMUNGSSYSTEM DAMIT | [2010/31] | English: | SELF-POWERED PUMP FOR HEATED LIQUID, FLUID HEATING AND STORAGE TANK AND FLUID HEATING SYSTEM EMPLOYING SAME | [2010/31] | French: | POMPE AUTOALIMENTÉE POUR LIQUIDE CHAUFFÉ, RÉSERVOIR DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE STOCKAGE DE FLUIDE ET SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE DE FLUIDE LES UTILISANT | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10161667.0 / EP2228605 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MK | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | IE | 07.05.2013 | LU | 07.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5351488 (SORENSEN WILFRED B [CA]) [A] 1,2,7,9,10,12,13,15,16 * columns 2, 3 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US4246890 (KRAUS ROBERT A, et al) [A] 1,2,9,10,12,13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4357932 (STACY W DODD) [A] 1,2,9,10,12,13,15,16 * columns 3-8 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4270521 (BREKKE CARROLL E) [A] 1,9,10,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4309986 (EASTMAN GEORGE Y, et al) [A] 9,10,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2383384 (MCKAY PETER [GB]) [A] 1,12 * pages 4-7 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5351488 (SORENSEN WILFRED B [CA]); | [A]US6042342 (ORIAN ITAMAR [IL]); | [A]US4651819 (YUMIKURA TSUNEO [JP], et al); | [A]US2007227529 (RUBIO MICHAEL ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US5351488 |