EP2282868 - MACHINE TOOL, PARTICULARLY OF THE MILLING AND BORING TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HPT SINERGY S.R.L. Piazza Salvemini, 7 35131 Padova / IT | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUELI, Francesco Via Colombo 55 I-35030 Selvazzano Dentro / IT | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/07] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09741981.6 | 22.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009EP54841 | Priority number, date | IT2008PD00140 | 08.05.2008 Original published format: IT PD20080140 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135763 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282868 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282868 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/00, B23Q1/38, B23Q1/48, B23Q5/32 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
B23Q1/4828 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0027 (EP,US);
B23Q1/38 (EP,US);
B23Q5/32 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303976 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINE, IM BESONDEREN ZUM FRÄSEN UND BOHREN | [2011/07] | English: | MACHINE TOOL, PARTICULARLY OF THE MILLING AND BORING TYPE | [2011/07] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL, EN PARTICULIER DU TYPE ALÉSEUSE-FRAISEUSE | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 29.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2012 | Decision despatched | 29.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2009 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | GB | 22.04.2014 | IE | 22.04.2014 | LU | 22.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3058559 (ROBERT OHRNBERGER) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 18; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR90355E (HONSBERG FA GEB) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006105951 (HPT SINERGY SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 * | by applicant | US3058559 |