EP2285844 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADEN, Andreas Kappeler Straße 2A 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KREILING, Stefan Benrodestr. 107 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
SCHÖNFELD, Rainer Kuhstraße 18 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
UNGER, Lothar Wilhelm-Haumann-Weg 32 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [2011/08] | Application number, filing date | 09741990.7 | 24.04.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP54943 | Priority number, date | DE20081023076 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023076 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135772 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285844 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285844 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/00, C08L51/08, C09D151/00, C09D137/00, C09D139/00, D06M13/355 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C09J151/003 (EP,US);
C08K5/357 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/33] | C08F292/00, C08K5/357, C08L51/10, C08L51/08, C08L51/00, C09D151/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/08] | C08F24/00, C08F26/00, C08F126/00, C08G61/12, C08J5/24, C09D137/00, C09D139/00, C09D139/04, C09J137/00, C09J139/00, C09J139/04, C08F124/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/08] | English: | POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION | [2011/08] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 30.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2009 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | AT | 24.04.2014 | IE | 24.04.2014 | LU | 24.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
AT | 24.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IE | 24.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 24.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002007022 (OOSEDO HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0141] - [0144] *; | [DX]US2007129509 (LI WEI H [US], et al) [DX] 1,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0082] - [0088]; claims 1-29 *; | [PA]WO2008060545 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] *; | [PA]WO2008076244 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-15 * paragraph [0039]; claims 1,10 * |