EP2293900 - METHOD FOR MACHINING AN EYEGLASS LENS BLANK AND EYEGLASS LENS BLANK COMPRISING A CONNECTING MATERIAL AND BLOCK PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider GmbH & Co. KG Biegenstrasse 8-12 35112 Fronhausen / DE | [2012/22] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Schneider GmbH & Co. KG Brückenstrasse 21 35239 Steffenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Gunter Wilhelm-Roser-Strasse 21 35037 Marburg / DE | 02 /
BUCHENAUER, Helwig Rothenbergstr. 1b 35232 Dautphetal-Buchenau / DE | 03 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Gärtnerstr. 8 35232 Dautphetal-Friedensdorf / DE | 04 /
HUTTENHUIS, Stephan In der Struth 2 35041 Marburg / DE | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Gunter Wilhelm-Roser-Strasse 21 35037 Marburg / DE | ||
02 /
BUCHENAUER, Helwig Rothenbergstr. 1b 35232 Dautphetal-Buchenau / DE | |||
03 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Gärtnerstr. 8 35232 Dautphetal-Friedensdorf / DE | |||
04 /
HUTTENHUIS, Stephan Birkenweg 1-3 52080 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Gunter Kirchspitze 8a 35037 Marburg / DE | ||
02 /
BUCHENAUER, Helwig Rothenbergstr. 1b 35232 Dautphetal-Buchenau / DE | |||
03 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Gärtnerstr. 8 35232 Dautphetal-Friedensdorf / DE | |||
04 /
HUTTENHUIS, Stephan Birkenweg 1-3 52080 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Thews, Gustav STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2013/25] |
Former [2011/11] | Thews, Gustav STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09742138.2 | 07.05.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009EP55567 | Priority number, date | DE20081022660 | 07.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008022660 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135920 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293900 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293900 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24B13/005 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B24B13/005 (EP,US);
B24B9/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES BRILLENGLASROHLINGS UND BRILLENGLASROHLING MIT VERBINDUNGSMASSE UND BLOCKSTÜCK | [2011/11] | English: | METHOD FOR MACHINING AN EYEGLASS LENS BLANK AND EYEGLASS LENS BLANK COMPRISING A CONNECTING MATERIAL AND BLOCK PIECE | [2011/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'USINAGE D'UN PALET DE VERRE DE LUNETTES ET PALET DE VERRE DE LUNETTES MUNI D'UNE MATIÈRE DE LIAISON ET D'UNE MOLETTE DE GLANTAGE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 10.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MK | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 07.05.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US1952373 (HILL HARRY W) [X] 1-6,9-11 * page 1, lines 6-12,80-108 * * page 2, columns 6-66,87-, line 143 * * figures 4,6,9,10 * [Y] 8; | [DY]DE10304388 (SCHNEIDER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DY] 8* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0008] , [0036] - [0045] * |