EP2279520 - METHOD FOR MAKING COMPLEMENTARY P AND N MOSFET TRANSISTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/05] | METHOD FOR MAKING COMPLEMENTARY P AND N MOSFET TRANSISTORS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING SUCH TRANSISTORS, AND PROCESSOR INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE SUCH DEVICE | ||
[2018/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARRIEU, Guilhem 9 rue des Vétérans F-59650 Villeneuve D'ascq / FR | 02 /
DUBOIS, Emmanuel 13 allée du Bel Air F-59890 Quesnoy Sur Deule / FR | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2011/05] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09742293.5 | 09.04.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009FR50642 | Priority number, date | FR20080052464 | 11.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852464 | [2011/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009136095 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2279520 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2279520 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L21/8238, H01L29/47, H01L21/265, H01L21/225, H01L29/66 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
H01L21/26513 (EP,US);
H01L21/2257 (EP,US);
H01L21/823814 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L29/665 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L21/8238, H01L29/47, H01L21/265, H01L21/225 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2011/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG KOMPLEMENTÄRER P- UND N-MOSFET-TRANSISTOREN | [2018/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING COMPLEMENTARY P AND N MOSFET TRANSISTORS | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS MOSFET COMPLÉMENTAIRES DE TYPE P ET N | [2018/19] |
Former [2011/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG KOMPLEMENTÄRER P- UND N-MOSFET-TRANSISTOREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT DERARTIGEN TRANSISTOREN UND PROZESSOR MIT MINDESTENS EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2011/05] | METHOD FOR MAKING COMPLEMENTARY P AND N MOSFET TRANSISTORS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING SUCH TRANSISTORS, AND PROCESSOR INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE SUCH DEVICE | ||
Former [2011/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS MOSFET COMPLÉMENTAIRES DE TYPE P ET N, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT DE TELS TRANSISTORS, ET PROCESSEUR COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN TEL DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2009 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | LU | 09.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.04.2009 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.04.2009 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2124428 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-13* figure -; claims 1-25 *; | [X]EP1763084 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033]; figures 1-36 *; | [X] - BERA L K ET AL, "Dopant-Segregated Ni-Silicide Schottky-Source/Drain CMOS on Strained-Si/SiGe Multiple Quantum-Well Channel on Bulk-Si", SOLID-STATE DEVICE RESEARCH CONFERENCE, 2006. ESSDERC 2006. PROCEEDING OF THE 36TH EUROPEAN, IEEE, PI, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0301-1, pages 290 - 293, XP031047050 [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,11 * page 290 - page 291; figure 9; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ESSDER.2006.307695 | [X] - QIU Z J ET AL, "Role of Si implantation in control of underlap length in Schottky-barrier source/drain MOSFETs on ultrathin body SOI", ULTIMATE INTEGRATION OF SILICON, 2008. ULIS 2008. 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080312), ISBN 978-1-4244-1729-2, pages 175 - 178, XP031256604 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,11 * page 175 - page 177; figure - * | [X] - ZHIJUN QIU ET AL, "A Comparative Study of Two Different Schemes to Dopant Segregation at NiSi/Si and PtSi/Si Interfaces for Schottky Barrier Height Lowering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080101), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 396 - 403, XP011199367 [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * page 396 - page 402; figure 1; table 1 * | [A] - KINOSHITA A ET AL, "High-performance 50-nm-gate-length schottky-source/drain MOSFETs with dopant-segregation junctions", VLSI TECHNOLOGY, 2005. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. 2005 SYMPOSIUM ON KYOTO, JAPAN JUNE 14-16, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050614), ISBN 978-4-900784-00-0, pages 158 - 159, XP010818281 [A] 1-13 * page 152; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/.2005.1469250 | [ ] - KINOSHITA A ET AL, "Solution for high-performance Schottky-source/drain MOSFETs: Schottky barrier height engineering with dopant segregation technique", VLSI TECHNOLOGY, 2004. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. 2004 SYMPOSIUM ON HONOLULU, HI, USA JUNE 15-17, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040615), ISBN 978-0-7803-8289-3, pages 168 - 169, XP010732846 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSIT.2004.1345459 | [A] - MATSUMOTO S ET AL, "CMOS APPLICATION OF SCHOTTKY SOURCE/DRAIN SOI MOSFET WITH SHALLOW DOPED EXTENSION", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO.; JP, (20040401), vol. 43, no. 4B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2170 - 2175, XP001227735 [A] 1-13 * page 2170 - page 2174; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.43.2170 | Examination | - "8.3.1 Aufbau der MOS-Transistoren und ihrer Isolation", D Widmann, H Mader, H Friedrich, Technologie hochintegrierter Schaltungen, 2. Auflage, Springer Verlag Berlin Heidelberg New York, (19960101), pages 275 - 283, ISBN 3-540-59357-8 | - WIDMANN D ET AL, TECHNOLOGIE HOCHINTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN, DETAILLIERTE PROZESSFOLGE AUSGEWÀHLTER GESAMTPROZESSE, TECHNOLOGIE HOCHINTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 309 - 318, (19960101), ISBN 978-3-540-59357-7, XP007914877 |