EP2287163 - 2-AMINO-3-SULPHONYL-TETRAHYDRO-PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDO-PYRIMIDINE ANTAGONISTS OF SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTORS, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivashchenko, Andrey Alexandrovich Ul. Abramtsevskaya, 4/2-27 Moscow, 127576 / RU | For all designated states Alla Chem, LLC. 318 N. Carson Street, Suite 208 Carson City, NV 89701 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYSIL, Volodymyr Mikhailovich ul. Revutskogo 44-436 Kiev 021140 / UA | 02 /
SAVCHUK, Nikolay Filippovich ul. Nametkina 9-35 Moscow 117420 / RU | 03 /
IVASHCHENKO, Alexander Vasilievich 2874 Calle Rancho Vista Encinitas California 92024 / US | 04 /
IVASHCHENKO, Andrey Alexandrovich Ul. Abramtsevskaya, 4/2-27 Moscow, 127576 / RU | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
KYSIL, Volodymyr Mikhailovich ul. Revutskogo 44-436 Kiev 021140 / UA | ||
02 /
SAVCHUK, Nikolay Filippovich ul. Nametkina 9-35 Moscow 117420 / RU | |||
03 /
IVASHCHENKO, Alexander Vasilievich 2874 Calle Rancho Vista Encinitas California 92024 / US | Representative(s) | Henrion, Oliver, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstraße 30 DE-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2011/08] | Application number, filing date | 09742910.4 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009RU00208 | Priority number, date | RU20080117845 | 07.05.2008 Original published format: RU 2008117845 | [2011/08] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009136813 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | RU | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287163 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2287163 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, A61P25/22, A61K31/519, A61P25/24, A61P25/18, A61P25/28, A61P25/08, A61P3/08, A61P25/26, A61P9/10, A61P25/16, A61P3/04 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | 2-AMINO-3-SULFONYLTETRAHYDROPYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDOPYRIMIDINANTAGONISTEN VON SEROTONIN-5-HT6-REZEPTOREN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2011/08] | English: | 2-AMINO-3-SULPHONYL-TETRAHYDRO-PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDO-PYRIMIDINE ANTAGONISTS OF SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTORS, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2011/08] | French: | 2-AMINO-3-SULPHONYL-5,6,7,8-TETRAHYDRO-PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDO -PYRIMIDINES AGISSANT COMME DES ANTAGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS 5-HT6 DE SÉROTONINE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILIASATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2010 | Translation filed | 07.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | IE | 30.04.2015 | LU | 30.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4066643 (DENZEL THEODOR, et al); | [A]US4066645 (DENZEL THEODOR, et al); | [A]US4072680 (DENZEL THEODOR, et al); | [A]WO2007147883 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) | by applicant | EP0941994 | WO03057674 | - HOLENZ J.; PAUWELS P.J.; DIAZ J.L.; MERCE R.; CODONY X.; BUSCHMANN H., "Medicinal chemistry strategies to 5-HT6 receptor ligands as potential cognitive enhancers and antiobesity agents", DRUG DISC. TODAY., (2006), vol. 11, pages 283 - 299 | - GE'RARD C.; MARTRES M.-P.; LEFE'VRE K.; MIQUEL M.-C.; VERGE' D.; LANFUMEY L.; DOUCET E.; HAMON M.; EL MESTIKAWY S., "Immuno-localisation of serotonin 5-HT6 receptor-like material in the rat central nervous system", BRAIN RESEARCH., (1997), vol. 746, pages 207 - 219 | - DAWSON L.A.; NGUYEN H.Q.; LI P., "The 5-HT(6) receptor antagonist SB-271046 selectively enhances excitatory neurotransmission in the rat frontal cortex and hippocampus", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY., (2001), vol. 25, pages 662 - 668 | - FOLEY A.G.; MURPHY K.J.; HIRST W.D.; GALLAGHER H.C.; HAGAN J.J.; UPTON N.; WALSH F.S.; REGAN C.M., "The 5-HT(6) receptor antagonist SB-271046 reverses scopolamine-disrupted consolidation of a passive avoidance task and ameliorates spatial task deficits in aged rats", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY., (2004), vol. 29, pages 93 - 100 | - RIEMER C.; BORRONI E.; LEVET-TRAFIT B.; MARTIN J.R.; POLI S.; PORTER R.H.; BOS M., "Influence of the 5-HT6 receptor on acetylcholine release in the cortex: pharmacological characterization of 4-(2-bromo-6-pyrrolidin-1-ylpyridine-4-sulfonyl)phenylamine, a potent and selective 5-HT6 receptor antagonist", J MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 1273 - 1276 | - KING M.V.; WOOLLEY M.L.; TOPHAM LA.; SLEIGHT A.J.; MARSDEN C.A.; FONE K.C., "5-HT6 receptor antagonists reverse delay-dependent deficits in novel object discrimination by enhancing consolidation e an effect sensitive to NMDA receptor antagonism", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 47, pages 195 - 204 | - FOLEY A.G.; MURPHY K.J.; HIRST W.D.; GALLAGHER H.C.; HAGAN J.J.; UPTON N.; WALSH F.S.; REGAN C.M., "The 5-HT(6) receptor antagonist SB-271046 reverses scopolamine-disrupted consolidation of a passive avoidance task and ameliorates spatial task deficits in aged rats", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 29, pages 93 - 100 | - VICKER S.P.; DOURISH C.T., "Serotonin receptor ligands and the treatment of obesity", CURR. OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS., (2004), vol. 5, pages 377 - 388 | - DAVIES S.L., "Drug discovery targets: 5-HT6 receptor", DRUG FUTURE., (2005), vol. 30, pages 479 - 495 | - WOOLLEY M.L., "5-ht6 receptors", CURR. DRUG TARGETS CNS NEUROL. DISORD., (2004), vol. 3, pages 59 - 79 | - BERGE S.M. ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J.PHARM.SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - MONSMA FJ JR; SHEN Y; WARD RP; HAMBLIN MW; SIBLEY DR, "Cloning and expression of a novel serotonin receptor with high affinity for tricyclic psychotropic drugs", MOL PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 43, pages 320 - 327 |