EP2274304 - METHOD OF TREATING CANCER USING A CMET AND AXL INHIBITOR AND AN ERBB INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC Corporation Service Company 2711 Centreville Road Suite 400 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [2014/15] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILMER, Tona, M. Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park NC 27709 / US | 02 /
GREGER, James, G. 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia PA 19406 / US | 03 /
LIU, Li 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia PA 19406 / US | 04 /
SHI, Hong 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia PA 19406 / US | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/03] | Reed, Michael Antony GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09743415.3 | 05.05.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US42768 | Priority number, date | US20080050322 | 05.05.2008 Original published format: US 50322 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009137429 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274304 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/00, C07D401/00, A61K31/47, A61K31/5377, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | C07D413/00, C07D401/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | AL | 03.11.2010 | BA | 03.11.2010 | RS | 03.11.2010 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM CMET- UND EINEM AXL-HEMMER SOWIE EINEM ERBB-HEMMER | [2011/03] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING CANCER USING A CMET AND AXL INHIBITOR AND AN ERBB INHIBITOR | [2011/03] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER À L AIDE D UN INHIBITEUR DE CMET ET D AXL ET D UN INHIBITEUR D ERBB | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007068895 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 2 *; | [XP]WO2008127710 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7,9-14 * figures 2,7 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 4 * * claims 1,2,13,18 *; | [AP] - CHI A S ET AL, "Antiangiogenic Strategies for Treatment of Malignant Gliomas", NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, ELSEVIER INC, US, vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NURT.2009.04.010, ISSN 1933-7213, (20090701), pages 513 - 526, (20090626), XP026254708 [AP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 523, column 1, paragraph 4 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nurt.2009.04.010 | [XP] - QIAN FAWN ET AL, "Inhibition of tumor cell growth, invasion, and metastasis by EXEL-2880 (XL880, GSK1363089), a novel inhibitor of HGF and VEGF receptor tyrosine kinases", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20091015), vol. 69, no. 20, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-4889, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 8009 - 8016, XP002601151 [XP] 13,14 * page 8009, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 8010, column 1, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-4889 | [A] - ECKEL F ET AL, "Emerging drugs for biliary cancer", EXPERT OPINION ON EMERGING DRUGS 200711 GB LNKD- DOI:10.1517/14728214.12.4.571, (200711), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1472-8214, pages 571 - 589, XP008150598 [A] 1-14 * tables 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14728214.12.4.571 | [AP] - NORDEN A D ET AL, "Antiangiogenic therapy in malignant gliomas", CURRENT OPINION IN ONCOLOGY 200811 US LNKD- DOI:10.1097/CCO.0B013E32831186BA, (200811), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 1040-8746, pages 652 - 661, XP008150601 [AP] 1-12 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CCO.0b013e32831186ba | [A] - BEAN JAMES ET AL, "MET amplification occurs with or without T790M mutations in EGFR mutant lung tumors with acquired resistance to gefitinib or erlotinib", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, vol. 104, no. 52, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0710370104, ISSN 0027-8424, (20071226), pages 20932 - 20937, (20071218), XP002566375 [A] 1-14 * page 20936, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 20935, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0710370104 | International search | [Y]US2007054928 (BANNEN LYNNE C [US], et al); | [Y]US2008058312 (ZEMBOWER DAVID E [US], et al) | Examination | - YI-SHING SHINH ET AL, "Expression of Axl in Lung Adenocarcinoma and Correlation with Tumor Progression", NEOPLASIA, US, (20051201), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:10.1593/neo.05640, ISSN 1476-5586, pages 1058 - 1064, XP055137005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1593/neo.05640 | - ZHANG YI-XIANG ET AL, "AXL is a potential target for therapeutic intervention in breast cancer progression", CANCER RESEARCH, AACR, US PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20080315), vol. 68, no. 6, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2661, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 1905 - 1915, XP002505662 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2661 | - VAJKOCZY PETER ET AL, "Dominant-negative inhibition of the Axl receptor tyrosine kinase suppresses brain tumor cell growth and invasion and prolongs survival", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20060411), vol. 103, no. 15, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0510923103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5799 - 5804, XP002505666 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0510923103 |