EP2296703 - IGF-II/GF-IIE BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyax Corp. 300 Technology Square 8th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific & Industrial Research Organisation Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRANSFIELD, Daniel 14 George Street Hanson, MA 02341 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Edward 55 Hill Road Apt. 200 Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 03 /
ADAMS, Timothy 193 Old Eltham Road Lower Plenty, Victoria 3052 / AU | 04 /
COSGROVE, Leah 80 Strangways Terrace North Adelaide, South Australia 5006 / AU | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Murphy, Colm Damien Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/09] |
Former [2011/12] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09743744.6 | 08.05.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009US43273 | Priority number, date | US20080053427P | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 53427 P | US20090163180P | 25.03.2009 Original published format: US 163180 P | US20080051956P | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 51956 P | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/12] | US20080053427 | 15.05.2008 | |
US20090163180 | 25.03.2009 | ||
US20080051956 | 09.05.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009137758 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2296703 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C12P21/08 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | IGF-II/GF-IIE-BINDUNGSPROTEINE | [2011/12] | English: | IGF-II/GF-IIE BINDING PROTEINS | [2011/12] | French: | PROTÉINES LIANT L'IGF-II/IGF-IIE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0492552 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 4,5 * example 6 * [I] 1,2,6-16; | [XI]WO2007022172 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * examples 1,3; claims 1, 10, 32, 33 * [I] 2,8-16; | [A] - SUNDEEP KHOSLA ET AL, "Use of Site-Specific Antibodies to Characterize the Circulating Form of Big Insulin-Like Growth Factor II in Patients with Hepatitis C-Associated Osteosclerosis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM,, (20020801), vol. 87, no. 8, doi:10.1210/JC.87.8.3867, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 3867 - 3870, XP008147568 [A] 1,2,4-16 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.87.8.3867 | [T] - DRANSFIELD DANIEL T ET AL, "A Human Monoclonal Antibody against Insulin-Like Growth Factor-II Blocks the Growth of Human Hepatocellular Carcinoma Cell Lines In vitro and In vivo", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (201006), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 1809 - 1819, XP002680461 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-09-1134 | International search | [A]US2007004910 (SEXTON DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2007104715 (NORDSTEDT CHRISTER [SE], et al); | [X]US2007196376 (RAEBER OLIVIA [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0492552 | WO2007022172 | - SUNDEEP ET AL., J. CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (20020801), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 3867 - 3870 | - DRANSFIELD ET AL., MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (201006), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 1809 - 1819 |