EP2342900 - GENERATION OF OCCLUSION DATA FOR IMAGE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREMSE, Felix c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PHILOMIN, Vasanth c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
LIU, Fang c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09743931.9 | 21.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009IB54638 | Priority number, date | EP20080167688 | 28.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08167688 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010049850 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342900 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
G06T15/40 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/10 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON VERDECKUNGSDATEN FÜR BILDEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2011/28] | English: | GENERATION OF OCCLUSION DATA FOR IMAGE PROPERTIES | [2011/28] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES D OCCLUSION POUR DES PROPRIÉTÉS D IMAGE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - SHADE J ET AL, "Layered depth images", COMPUTER GRAPHICS. SIGGRAPH 98 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. ORLANDO, FL, JULY 19- 24, 1998; [COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. SIGGRAPH], ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, ISBN 978-0-89791-999-9, (19980719), pages 231 - 242, (19980101), XP002523434 [X] 1-15 * page 236 - page 239 * | [X] - FEHN C, "Depth-image-based rendering (DIBR), compression, and transmission for a new approach on 3D-TV", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, US, (20040531), vol. 5291, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 93 - 104, XP002444222 [X] 1-15 * page 100 - page 101 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.524762 | [A] - FOLEY J D ET AL, "COMPUTER GRAPHICS PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE", COMPUTER GRAPHICS. PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE, READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, (19960101), pages 649 - 720, XP002082444 [A] 1-15 * page 649 - page 720 * |