EP2353149 - METHOD AND CONVEYOR DEVICE FOR RETURNING EMPTIES, IN PARTICULAR BOTTLES AND CANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envipco Holding N.V. Leliegracht 10 1015 DE Amsterdam / NL | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDSCHICK, Bert Bärschstrasse 4 02785 Obersdorf / DE | 02 /
LÖNING, Johann Rummelweg 40 26122 Oldenburg / DE | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Seewald, Jürgen, et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König Theaterstrasse 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2011/32] | Seewald, Jürgen, et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König, Theaterstrasse 6 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 09744068.9 | 20.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009EP07507 | Priority number, date | DE20081052330 | 20.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008052330 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010046085 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353149 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2353149 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06, B07C5/12, B65G47/14 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
B07C5/122 (EP,US);
B65G47/1471 (EP,US);
G07F7/0609 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | G07F7/06, G07C5/12, B65G47/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2011/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TRANSPORTEINRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKNAHME VON LEERGUT, INSBESONDERE VON FLASCHEN UND DOSEN | [2011/32] | English: | METHOD AND CONVEYOR DEVICE FOR RETURNING EMPTIES, IN PARTICULAR BOTTLES AND CANS | [2011/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE TRANSPORT POUR LE RECYCLAGE D'EMBALLAGES VIDES EN RETOUR, EN PARTICULIER DE BOUTEILLES ET DE BOÎTES | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2009 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | AT | 20.10.2019 | IE | 20.10.2019 | LU | 20.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
AT | 20.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [PA]EP2105891 (WINCOR NIXDORF INT GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0063853 (CAN & BOTTLE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 28 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2254791 (GRAESSLE WALTER) [A] 4-6,8 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]CA948142 (PACE PACKAGING CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * | Examination | WO0212095 | DE102007013204 | US6691854 | WO2007133063 | US3331486 | US3715024 | US5078258 |